Page v. Grand Home Holdings Inc.
Plaintiff: Darren Page
Defendant: Grand Home Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02754
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED 25 . Plaintiff must file motion for preliminary approval on or before 2/5/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/31/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING the parties' Joint Discovery Plan 20 . If the parties wish to advance the further case management conference currently set for 2/5/2014, they may jointly contact the Court's courtroom deputy to make that request. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/18/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/7/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Grand Home Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Home Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Amber Marie Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Page
Represented By: David S. Harris
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?