Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. Greystone Homes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Defendant: Greystone Homes, Inc. and Lennar Sales Corp.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02833
Filed: June 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 17 Stipulation Extending Time to Comply with Deadlines and Continuing Case Mangement Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 14 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 10 Stipulation Extending Time to Comply with Deadlines & Continuing Case Management Conference re 9 Case Management Scheduling Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/26/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. Greystone Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystone Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Sales Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?