Our Children's Earth Foundation et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: Our Children's Earth Foundation and Ecological Rights Foundation
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Bob Perciasepe, Jared Blumenthal, National Marine Fisheries Service, Rebecca Blank, Rodney McInnis, U.S. Department of the Interior, Ken Salazar and Ren Lohoefener
Case Number: 3:2013cv02857
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 8, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Response to Objection to Reply Evidence in Support of Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 11, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER re MOTIONS FOR DE NOVO REVIEW; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE; VACATING HEARING; REMINDING COUNSEL TO PROVIDE TIMELY CHAMBERS COPIES. Responses due by 2/24/2016. Replies due by 3/2/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE; VACATING HEARING. Responses due by 2/24/2016. Replies due by 3/2/2016. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/10/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
September 16, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 79 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing as to 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge KANDIS A. WESTMORE on 9/16/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 2, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 70 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Continue Hearing filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/2/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 3, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 71 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 20, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Unusable Chambers Copies of 74 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Bob Perciasepe, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. A usable chambers copy shall be submitted no later than 7/24/2015. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/20/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking [69-1] Reply Declaration of Christopher Sproul. Amended declaration due by 6/15/2015. Defendants' surreply due by 7/6/2015. Motion Hearing continued to 9/3/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/20/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
March 16, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Our Children's Earth Foundation, Ecological Rights Foundation, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 62 STIPULAT ION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE, 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Responses due by 4/23/2015. Replies due by 5/6/2015. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/16/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 3, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding unusable chambers copies of Plaintiffs' 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Our Children's Earth Foundation, Ecological Rights Foundation. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/3/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
August 25, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
July 7, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND CONTINUE HEARING ON 28 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
September 23, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Our Children's Earth Foundation et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Our Children's Earth Foundation
Represented By: Michael A. Costa
Represented By: Jodene Louise Isaacs
Represented By: Christopher Alan Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecological Rights Foundation
Represented By: Michael A. Costa
Represented By: Jodene Louise Isaacs
Represented By: Christopher Alan Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Perciasepe
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Blumenthal
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Blank
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney McInnis
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ren Lohoefener
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?