Synopsys, Inc. v. Atoptech, Inc
Plaintiff: Synopsys, Inc.
Defendant: Atoptech, Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv02965
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 967 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Consent judgment in favor of Synopsys, Inc. against Atoptech, Inc. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 961 ORDER CONDITIONALLY CLOSING CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 957 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/12/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ATOPTECH, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The hearing on the pending motions for summary judgment remains set for January 20, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 937 JOINT STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND ORDER. Synopsys' claim for infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,567,967 is dismissed with prejudice. ATopTech's defenses pertaining to U.S. Patent No. 6,567,967 are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 914 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR FINAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. The motion is denied, without prejudice to re-filing after the patent claims have been resolved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/9/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NOVEMBER 16, 2016 ORDER. Defendant's motion is denied, without prejudice to defendant's filing a motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration, to be presented to Magistrate Judge Ryu. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 811 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Synopsys' Second Set of Interrogatories. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER re 809 Letter Brief filed by Atoptech, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on November 15, 2016. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER re 864 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Synopsys, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on November 9, 2016. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 874 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION; FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum of Decision, the Court finds in favor of Synopsys and against ATopTech on the defense of equitable estoppel. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/24/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying as moot 863 Administrative Motion; granting 864 Motion for Leave to File. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 866 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY AND ORDER. The expert discovery cutoff is extended to October 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/11/16. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff's motion is denied, without prejudice to plaintiff's filing a motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration, to be presented to Magistrate Judge Ryu. Plaintiff's administrative motion to file exhibits under seal is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/05/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 856 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY AND ORDER. The expert discovery cutoff is extended to October 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/03/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER Denying Synopsys's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions 815 ; granting 830 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER RE: CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 16, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 839 JOINT STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND ORDER. Synopsys' claim for infringement of Claims 1-5, 7-12, and 22-26 of U.S. Patent No. 6,405,348 is dismissed with prejudice. ATopTech's defenses pertaining to Claims 1-5, 7-12, and 22-26 of U.S. Patent No. 6,405,348 are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 15, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER granting Stipulation re 803 Letter Brief filed by Atoptech, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/27/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 799 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO BRING AND USE EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER re Discovery Letter Brief RE: ESI Discovery 774 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/5/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Information Regarding the Deposition of Steven Meier, re: 775 Emergency Discovery Letter Brief Requesting for an Emergency Order Quashing the Deposition Subpoena of Steven Meier and for a Protective Order filed by Synopsys, Inc., 782 Letter Brief, filed by Atoptech, Inc. The parties' supplemental joint letter is due by July 7, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/01/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER re Deposition of Steven Meier; Requesting Response from ATopTech regarding 775 Emergency Discovery Letter Brief Requesting for an Emergency Order Quashing the Deposition Subpoena of Steven Meier and for a Protective Order filed by Synopsys, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/27/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 773 REVISED JOINT ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR ATOPTECH'S FOURTH AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 763 JOINT STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 756 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL EXCHANGES FOR THE BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER Requesting Response from Synopsys, Inc. re 744 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff Synopsys, Inc.'s Bench Trial Motion in Limine No. 1 and Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/07/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU PLAINTIFFS BENCH TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. The July 1, 2016 hearings before the undersigned are vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER CONSTRUING DEFENDANT ATOPTECH, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [ECF NO. 740] AS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; GRANTING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MODIFYING IN PART AND VACATING IN PART ORDER, FILED MAY 16, 2016; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (1) PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND (2) CERTAIN SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING VERDICT ON BREACH OF CONTRACT, AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The motions are denied, without prejudice to re-filing aft er the equitable estoppel issue has been resolved. The parties are directed to meet and confer, and submit, no later than April 22, 2016, a joint stipulation as to the manner and schedule upon which said issue will be presented to the Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 11, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 462); DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (1) PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) CERTAIN SUPPORTING EXHIBITS (DOC. NO. 427); DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (a) PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 AND (b) CERTAIN SUPPORTING EXHIBITS (DOC. NO. 403); DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (a) PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND (b) CERTAIN SUPPORTING EXHIBITS (DOC. NO. 577). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 9, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (a) PORTIONS OF ITS MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND (b) CERTAIN SUPPORTING EXHIBITS; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 636 FURTHER PRETRIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ADMISSION OF IDENTIFIED EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 29, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 622 FURTHER PRETRIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TRIAL DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DAVID B. COCHRAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER for JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/18/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 598 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROVIDE AND USE EQUIPMENT AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Plaintiff is directed to contact the Deputy Clerk to arrange for access to the courtroom. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING. Based on Synopsys's applications for supplementary registration, the Court finds Synopsys has effectively accomplished supplementary registration of t he previously unregistered material identified therein, and, consequently, is entitled to go forward on each of its remaining claims. The Court further finds the effective date of each such supplementary registration is the respective date of the corresponding basic registration. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN SINGLE-SIDED FORMAT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/27/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. To the extent the administrative motion seeks permission to seal the entir ety of Exhibits 9, 11, 13, 14, and 16, the motion is granted. To the extent the administrative motion seeks permission to seal the entirety of Exhibit 10 and a portion of the reply brief, the motion is denied. Synopsys is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, unredacted versions of Exhibit 10 and the reply brief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT AND EXHIBITS 3-6 IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANT. The Court defers ruling on the administrative motion to the extent it seeks t o seal Exhibits 3 and 4 and related portions of the opposition, pending Synopsys's filing, by January 29, 2016, a version of each said exhibit in which the redactions are limited to sealable material. To the extent the motion seeks to seal Exhib its 5 and 6 and related portions of the opposition, the motion is denied, and ATopTech is directed to file said exhibits in the public record no later than January 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 449 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice. The court will hold a hearing on the parties' new joint letter brief filed by February 11, 2016 on February 25, 2016 at 11:00 a.m.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Synopsys's Motion to Supplement: (1) ATopTech's opposition shall be filed on or before January 15, 2016. (2) Synopsys's reply shall be filed on or before January 19, 2016. (3) Unless the Court orders otherwise, the hearing will be held on January 22, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (1) To the extent Count I, Copyright Infringement, is based on asserte d infringement of input and output formats used in unregistered versions of Synopsys's static timing analysis software programs that pre-date the registered versions of those programs, ATopTech's motion for summary judgment is granted. (2) In all other respects, ATopTech's motion is denied. (3) To the extent ATopTech bases its Ninth Affirmative Defense, Excuse of Performance, on the theory that Synopsys breached the CPLA by extending such agreement multiple times without disclos ing Synopsys's position that Extreme DA lacked ownership rights in the formats at issue, Synopsys's motion is granted. (4) In all other respects, Synopsys's motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 489 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROVIDE AND USE EQUIPMENT AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. The parties are directed to contact the Deputy Clerk to arrange for access to the courtroom. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Thomas W. Ritchie is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ATOPTECH, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER REMOVING INCORRECTLY FILED DOCKET ENTRY NO. 446-25. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2015. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TRIAL, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATES. The hearing on the motions for summary judgment is continued to December 18, 2015; the pretrial conference is continued to February 9, 2016; and the trial is continued to February 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND FACTUAL ALLEGATIONS. The motion to dismiss is denied. The motion to strike ATopTech's Eleventh and Fifteenth Affirmative Defenses is granted, with leave to amend the Fifteenth Affirmative Defense. The motion to strike factual allegations is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE; REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To the extent Synopsys seeks an order excluding evidence that allegedly infringing material has been removed from ATopTech' ;s software, the motion is denied. To the extent Synopsys's motion seeks to reopen fact discovery, the motion is granted. The remaining issue is the scope of said discovery, the resolution of which is referred to Magistrate Judge Ryu. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ATOPTECH, INC.'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCKET ENTRY NO. 397. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER re 383 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Atoptech, Inc. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 385 Order on Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Synopsys's motion for leave to file a second Amended Complaint is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendant's administrative motion to file portions of its opposition and exhibits B, D, E, F, and G to the supporting declaration is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The hearing scheduled for September 11, 2015, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
September 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER DENYING JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 330 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/07/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AT THE COURTHOUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/04/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. The Court hereby grants the Administrative Motion. ATopTech shall file its Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims by September 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER RE: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 25, 2015. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL To the extent Synopsys seeks to file Exhibit O under seal, the motion is granted and Exhibit O to the Michael Declaration shall remain under seal. To the extent Synopsys seeks to file Exhibits C - K and P - R to the Michael Declaration, as well as portions of the Motion to Amend, under seal, themotions are denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Synopsys' motion to dismiss and strike is granted as follows: 1. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of Counts I, II, IV, V, and VII the motion is granted, and said counts are dismissed without leave to amend. 2. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of Counts III, VI, and VIII, the motion is granted, and said counts are dismissed with leave to amend. 3. To the extent the motion seeks an order striking the Seventh Affirmative Defense, the motion is granted, and said affirmative defense is stricken without leave to amend. 4. To the extent the motion seeks an order striking the portion of the Eleventh Affirmative Defense that is based on statements allegedly made to customers, the motion is granted, and said portion of the affirmative defense is stricken without leave to amend. 5. To the extent the motion seeks an order striking the Fifteenth Affirmative Defense, the motion is gra nted, and said affirmative defense is stricken with leave to amend. ATopTech shall file its Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims no later than August 28, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to Plaintiff Synopsys, Inc's "Motion to Dismiss Defendant ATopTech's Second Amen ded Counterclaims and Striking Affirmative Defenses Nos. 7, 11 and 15," the Court deems the matter appropriate for determination on the parties' respective written submissions, and vacates the hearing scheduled for August 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 5, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER RE: DEADLINE FOR FILING JOINT DISCOVERY LETTERS. The court extends the deadline to meet and confer and file joint discovery letters on the issues raised in Dockets 316-318 from July 17, 2015 to July 24, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/16/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL AND EX PARTE DISCOVERY LETTERS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Motions terminated: 318 317 316 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/08/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL. Motions terminated: 274 192 283 287 .. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/02/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the hearing on Synopsys' Motion to Dismiss ATopTech's Second Amended Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses Nos. 7, 11, and 15 is continued to August 7, 2015 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 24, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER DENYING SYNOPSYS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE The motion is denied, for the reason that Synopsys has failed to show the subject orders are clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 9, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 272 Motion for Leave to File; denying 273 Motion for Sanctions (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER TAKING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 273 UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS ON MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/11/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AND TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS AND DEFENSES For the reasons stated on the record, Counts I through VII are dismissed, the Ninth and Eleventh Affirmative Defenses are stricken, and the challenged portio ns of paragraphs 2, 6, 9, 12, 15, and 28 of the answer are stricken. ATopTech is afforded leave to amend to cure the deficiencies noted, any such amended pleading to be filed no later than June 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES AND DISCOVERY LIMITS FOR SYNOPSYS' PATENT CLAIMS The joint proposed deadlines and discovery limits relating to Synopsys patentclaims are approved, with one exception: the pretrial conference shall be held on Tuesday, February 14, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 27, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/15/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND BIFURCATE As to all claims based on U.S. Patent Nos. 6,405,348 6,507,941, 6,237,127 and 6,567,967, the motion is granted and the stay is lifted. To the extent Synopsys seeks to bifurcate its copyright and breach claims from its patent claims, the motion is granted. To the extent Synopsys seeks to bifurcate its copyright and breach claims from ATopTech's antitrust counterclaims, the Court, at ATopTech's unopposed request, defers ruling, pending its determination of Synopsys' motion to dismiss all counterclaims, which motion is scheduled for hearing on May 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MARCH 16, 2015 ORDER The motion is denied, without prejudice to Synopsys' submitting to Magistrate Judge Ryu a motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration, see Civil L.R. 7-9(b), or any other appropriate filing seeking reconsideration of the subject order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE; VACATING HEARING The Court vacates the hearing scheduled for March 27, 2015, and denies Synopsys' motion as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 23, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 243 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER GRANTING SYNOPSYS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION The motion for reconsideration is hereby granted, and the challenged determinations, that certain of Synopsys' breach of contract claims are subject to dismissal to the extent those claims are predicated on conduct alleged to have occurred after Synopsys deposited its proprietary material with the United States Copyright Office, are hereby set aside and vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION re: LETTER 193 . By February 11, 2015 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall meet and confer and file with the court a letter of no more than one page providing Synopsys' definition of "Accused Instrumentalities" as used in Synopsys' discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/10/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 193 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/5/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT Defendant is hereby ordered to immediately submit a chambers copy of its Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT The date for submitting the further status conference statement is extended to Monday, February 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/24/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING SYNOPSYS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION Although the Court does not agree that all of the arguments made in the instant motion were presented prior to the rulings Synopsys now challenges, the Court fin ds it appropriate to afford Synopsys leave to move for reconsideration. In the interest of time, the Court will consider the instant motion as Synopsys' motion for reconsideration, and hereby sets the following briefing schedule: ATopTechs oppos ition shall be filed on or before February 4, 2015; Synopsys reply shall be filed on or before February 11, 2015. Unless otherwise ordered, the matter will stand submitted as of February 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS The motion is granted to the extent Synopsys' breach of contract claim is based on copying and use of material other than PrimeTime and GoldTime input and output formats and to the extent it is based on copying, use, and/or disclosure of material after Synopsys filed such material with the Copyright Office. The motion is granted to the extent Synopsys' breach of the implied covenant claim is based on access to, downloading of, and/or any other use of material not referenced in the parties agreements. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS The hearing scheduled for November 21, 2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING ATOPTECH'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL Exhibits A-C to the Declaration of Paul Alexander shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Arnold & Porter LLP is substituted in place of Dickstein Shapiro LLP as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/26/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION WALLING OFF MR. JEFFREY MILLER AND WITHDRAWING SYNOPSYS'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DICKSTEIN SHAPIRO LLP. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING ATOPTECH, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PATENT CLAIMS (COUNTS II-V) PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 22, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING SYNOPSYS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS SUPPORTING SYNOPSYS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DICKSTEIN SHAPIRO LLP. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 125 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 114 Discovery Letter Brief Without Prejudice.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DIRECTING CORPORATE DEFENDANT TO OBTAIN NEW COUNSEL; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF ORDER DISQUALIFYING O'MELVENY AND MYERS LLP PENDING WRIT OF MANDAMUS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 2, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. Given the procedural posture of the case, judicial intervention regarding the discovery disputes raised in Synopsys' letter shall be postponed until after Judge Chesney's ruling on ATopTech's motion to stay. Motions terminated: 105 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/16/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES; AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL 94 WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/03/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY O'MELVENY AND MYERS LLP. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES; VACATING MARCH 7, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING SYNOPSYS' EMERGENCY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Synopsys may file a reply brief not to exceed 7 pages, by February 28, 2014, including responses to ATopTechs supplemental opposition and the questions posed by the Court during the February 6, 2014 conference call with counsel. Such page limit does not include declarations. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING SYNOPSYS INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET DEADLINE FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/19/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 46 Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 25 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synopsys, Inc. v. Atoptech, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synopsys, Inc.
Represented By: Jane Louise Froyd
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Represented By: Joe Chuan-Che Liu
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Michael
Represented By: Robert Allan Mittelstaedt
Represented By: Krista Sue Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atoptech, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?