Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Morales et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Iliana Morales, A.M. and C.M.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03058
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING re 25 Letter filed by Huguette Cuadra Tijerino, A.M., C.M. for Ms. Cuadra's personal appearance be waived at the settlement conference on 11/18/13 at 9:30 AM before Judge Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 10/25/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM re 22 Proposed Order filed by Huguette Cuadra Tijerino, A.M., C.M.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013) Modified on 10/16/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/26/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iliana Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Represented By: Mark J. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?