Whalen v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Jennifer Whalen
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Movant: Thomas Mitchell
Case Number: 3:2013cv03072
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER Granting 515 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/28/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 473 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 393 Defendant Ford's Motion for Partial Decertification of Classes. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Preliminary Approval of Settlement Should Not Be Denied. Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/14/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 414 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 412 TO EXTENDTIME FOR PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/15/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES. Status Report due by 3/2/2018. Status Conference reset for 3/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 341 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 352 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 361 REGARDING CLASS NOTICE AND LAST DAY FOR OPT-OUTS and 341 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion for SJ Hearing reset from 2/1/2018 to 2/6/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 358 (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen GRANTING 349 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 STIPULATION AND ORDER Approving Protocol for Disseminating Notification to the Certified Classes and Appointing JND Legal Administration as the Notice Administrator. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 13, 2017. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 331 Regarding Release of Class Member Contact Information filed by Michael Ervin, Grif Rosser, Jason Zuchowski, Jennifer Whalen, Thomas Mitchell, Jose Randy Rodriguez, Joe D'Aguanno, Deb Makowski, Art Avedisian. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 290 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration ; and denying 291 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 283 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; granting 285 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion for Leave to File; granting 263 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 252 Modification to Deadline to File Responsive Declaration Regarding Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Class Certification Brief filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Amended Discovery Order re: Singer deposition. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/22/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Page Limit for Defendant Ford's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 208 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Further Modification To Deadline To File Responsive Declaration Regarding Motion To Seal Class Certification Brief filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 193 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Modification to Deadline to File Responsive Declaration Regarding Motion to Seal Class Certification Brief filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/3/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Michael Ervin, Grif Rosser, Jason Zuchowski, Jennifer Whalen, Thomas Mitchell, Jose Randy Rodriguez, Joe D'Aguanno, Deb Makowski, Art Avedisian. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 187 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Modifications to Certain Discovery Deadlines filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Modifications to Case Management Conference Date, and Discovery and Class Certification Deadlines filed by Ford Motor Company Class Certification Motion Hearing sreet for 5/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 157 Motion to Dismiss (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 168 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE INFORMATION, TRADE SECRETS, COMPUTER SOFTWARE, SOURCE CODE, AND RELATED INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FOR NON-PARTY, MICROSOFT CORPORATION filed by Jennifer Whalen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/17/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 166 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Jennifer Whalen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/16/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 157 MOTION to Dismiss Ford Motor Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 8/27/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines Regarding Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Whalen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/26/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 138 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Vehicle Inspection Protocol filed by Jennifer Whalen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Michael Ervin, Grif Rosser, Jason Zuchowski, Jennifer Whalen, Thomas Mitchell, Jose Randy Rodriguez, Joe D'Aguanno, Deb Makowski, Art Avedisian. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Discovery Order re: 122 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/12/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 120 FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE INFORMATION, TRADE SECRETS, COMPUTER SOFTWARE, SOURCE CODE AND RELATED INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2014.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RESETTING CMC to 8/14/14 at 10:30. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 56 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Jennifer Whalen, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 71 STIPULATI ON WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Continuing Case Management Conference. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Jennifer Whalen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/14/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 61 Notice (Other) filed by Jennifer Whalen. COURT TO CALL COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting (21) Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:13-cv-03072-EMC. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whalen v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Whalen
Represented By: Michael A. Caddell
Represented By: Michael A. Caddell
Represented By: Cynthia B. Chapman
Represented By: Cory Steven Fein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Thomas Mitchell
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?