Kalincheva v. Neubarth

Plaintiff: Magdalina Kalincheva
Defendant: Jesse Neubarth
Case Number: 3:2013cv03212
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF TRANSFER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
September 24, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 19 DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
July 25, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/25/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
August 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FREE ACCESS AND EXEMPTION FROM PACER USER FEES 24 25 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/21/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalincheva v. Neubarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalina Kalincheva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Neubarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.