Poole v. United States Of America

Defendant: United States Of America
Plaintiff: Willie F. Poole
Case Number: 3:2013cv03231
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/8/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
April 3, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/3/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
May 30, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/30/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
August 25, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/25/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie F. Poole
Represented By: Joseph Myszka
Represented By: Andrew Paul Crousore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.