A.C. v. City of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: A.C.
Defendant: City of Santa Clara and Michael Sellers
Case Number: 3:2013cv03276
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/15/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Scheduling Order Jury Selection/Jury Trial (10 day) set for 12/2/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/1/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RE: 127 REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Re 122 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/25/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Corrected ORDER 111 by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 77 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on September 14, 2015. (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. granting 105 Stipulation. The pretrial conference in this matter is rescheduled for Monday, October 5, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California.(hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 102 Stipulation EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES BY ONE WEEK. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on July 22, 2015. (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE 77 . Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2015. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/2/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Re 66 Discovery Letter Brief. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 85 Stipulation EXTENDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Stipulation FURTHER EXTENDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Re 66 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/20/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 68 Stipulation EXTENDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Re 66 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/20/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 61 Stipulation EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR FACT DISCOVERY, EXPERT DISCLOSURE/DISCOVERYAND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Frank Hagg, Josh Higgins, City of Santa Clara, Nathan Crescini, Mike Horn, Troy Cardin. Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/2014. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Frank Hagg, Josh Higgins, City of Santa Clara, Nathan Crescini, Mike Horn, Troy Cardin Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 42 . Settlement Conference set for 8/8/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/15/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Stipulated Protective Order filed by City of Santa Clara, Michael Sellers. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Mediation Deadline filed by A.C. Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/3/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by City of Santa Clara, Michael Sellers. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.C. v. City of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?