United States of America v. Ismail

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Sellam Ismail
Case Number: 3:2013cv03339
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Internal Revenue Service Summons should not be enforced. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/22/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
August 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/07/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
September 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/12/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ismail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sellam Ismail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.