Dell Inc. et al v. Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc., Hitachi LTD, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan, Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Benq Corporation, Benq America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Optiarc Inc., NEC Corporation, Sony NEC Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc America Inc., Sony Electronics Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation Korea
Case Number: 3:2013cv03350
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2422 in 3:10-md-02143-RS)(#90 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) RE Dismissal of Defendants Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corp., Philips Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Lite-On IT Corp. of Taiwan, and Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. By Dell Inc. and Dell Products L filed by Dell Products L.P., Dell Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER (2319 in 3:10-md-02143-RS), (84 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) RE MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SPECIFIC TO THE DELL ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (82 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) (2317 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF HLDS AND HITACHI DEFENDANTS BY DELL INC. AND DELL PRODUCTS L.P. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER (2266 in 3:10-md-02143-RS), (68 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) REGARDING THE PLDS DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO DELLS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF NEC CORPORATION BY DELL INC. AND DELL PRODUCTS (#2236 in 3:10-md-02143-RS), (#65 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Amended Complaint of Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 27 REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dell Inc. et al v. Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Debra Dawn Bernstein
Represented By: Rodney J Ganske
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer Jordan
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Adrian James Sawyer
Represented By: Jon G. Shepherd
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Tuck
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell Products L.P.
Represented By: Debra Dawn Bernstein
Represented By: Rodney J Ganske
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer Jordan
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Adrian James Sawyer
Represented By: Jon G. Shepherd
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Tuck
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benq Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benq America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Optiarc Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Optiarc America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation Korea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?