Pacle v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (SW)
Plaintiff: Alma Pacle
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (SW)
Case Number: 3:2013cv03379
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/12/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Discovery due by 5/12/2014. Motions due by 6/2/2014. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 8/26/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated 5 days. M otion Hearing set for 7/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson.CASE REFERRED to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/15/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/03/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting 9 Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's third cause of action for disparate impact. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacle v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (SW)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (SW)
Represented By: Lena Patrice Ryan
Represented By: Patricia K. Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Pacle
Represented By: Frank P. Sarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?