Frlekin et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Amanda Frlekin and Dean Pelle
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03451
Filed: July 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER RE BILL OF COSTS re 341 Bill of Costs filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE Responses due by 1/5/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/22/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
November 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE re 323 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 322 MOTION to Strike. Responses due by 10/29/2015. Replies due by 11/2/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER APPROVING JOINT DISSEMINATION PLAN re 307 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Apple Inc., 308 Notice (Other) filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/11/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER MODIFYING JOINT DISSEMINATION PLAN Updated Joint Plan due by 8/10/2015 at Noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/3/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REMINDER TO COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/17/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER APPROVING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 278 Motion to Certify Class Joint Notice proposal due 7/29 at NOON. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER RE FURTHER BRIEFING Responses due by 7/8/2015 at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/7/2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING Supplemental briefs due by 7/7/2015 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/4/2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/4/2015)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup granting 276 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup re 259 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting in part denying in part 263 ; granting in part and denying in part 264 . (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL 246 by Hon. William Alsup.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION ON CLASS CERTIFICATION OPPOSITIONre 242 MOTION to Certify Class, 249 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Responses due by 5/28/2015 at NOON. Replies due by 6/4/2015 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 19, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup re 221 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Response due by 1/16/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 9, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS, CONSOLIDATING CASES, AND REQUESTING BRIEFING. Motion due by 1/6/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 23, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND REQUEST FOR BRIEFING. Brief due by 12/15/2014 at noon. Joint Response due by 12/22/2014 at noon. Show Cause by 12/23/2014 at noon. Reply due by 12/29/2014 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014) Modified on 12/9/2014 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION RE NOVEMBER 20 DISCOVERY HEARING re 200 Stipulation.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REQUEST RE PROPOSED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PAUL WEINER PRO HAC VICE re 191 Motion, 189 Motion.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 13, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING re 184 Discovery Letter Brief. Response due by 11/17/2014 at noon. Two-hour meet-and-confer from 8:00 a.m. continuing until 10:00 a.m. on November 20. Discovery Hearing set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING re 179 Discovery Letter. Response due November 10 at noon. Three-hour Meet-and-Confer in Court's jury room beginning at 8:00 AM and continuing to 11:00 AM 11/12/2014. Discovery Hearing set for 11/12/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 6, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY FOR CALIFORNIA STATE-LAW CLAIMS re 166 Order Re Stay, 56 Case Management Order, 175 Stipulation. Discovery due by 12/1/2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 3, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER STAYING CASE AND DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 156 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/30/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REQUEST TO ADDRESS PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re 153 Supplemental Brief, filed by Amanda Frlekin. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/1/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY AND FINDING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME MOOT by Hon. William Alsup denying 150 Motion to Stay.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 SCHEDULING ORDER FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 20 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/20/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER AMENDING CAPTIONING OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/28/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON MOTION TO CERTIFY, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL, AND MOTION TO APPROVE DISCOVERY REQUEST. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/9/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/6/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF FRLEKIN AND KILKER ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/13/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONSOLIDATION Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION of Wade Wilkinson. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/17/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013) Modified on 10/17/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/17/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/23/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frlekin et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Frlekin
Represented By: Brett R Gallaway
Represented By: Louis Ginsberg
Represented By: Kimberly A. Kralowec
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Kralowec
Represented By: Lee Shalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Pelle
Represented By: Brett R Gallaway
Represented By: Louis Ginsberg
Represented By: Kimberly A. Kralowec
Represented By: Lee Shalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Todd Kenneth Boyer
Represented By: Karin Morgan Cogbill
Represented By: Nicolas Thomas Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?