Teece v. Kuwait Finance House (Bahrain) B.S.C. et al
Plaintiff: David John Teece
Defendant: Kuwait Finance House (Bahrain) B.S.C., Abdulhakeem Al-Khayyat, Adnan Malik and Paul Mercer
Case Number: 3:2013cv03603
Filed: August 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 113 Stipulation filed by David John Teece Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/16/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE re 111 Letter, filed by Abdulhakeem Al-Khayyat, Paul Mercer, Adnan Malik, Kuwait Finance House (Bahrain) B.S.C. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/12/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER APPOINTING THE HONORABLE RICHARD KRAMER (RETIRED) AS SPECIAL MASTER. Richard A. Kramer appointed.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/1/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND REQUESTING AFFIDAVIT FROM PROPOSED SPECIAL MASTER by Hon. William Alsup denying 102 Motion to Strike.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE ATTORNEYS FEES ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/2/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order Approving Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/1/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE SUPERSEDEAS BOND. Responses due by 7/31/2014. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/28/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re 79 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by David John Teece, 67 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 77 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by David John Teece. Signed by Judge William Alsup on July 10, 2014. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE STIPULATION. Signed by Judge William Alsup on July 7, 2014. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 FURTHER ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re 67 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 53 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed by Abdulhakeem Al-Khayyat, Paul Mercer, Adnan Malik, Kuwait Finance House (Bahrain) B.S.C.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on May 23, 2014. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/24/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING re 9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by David John Teece. John Cambria substitutes in as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/12/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING re 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by David John Teece, Attorney Lee S. Wolosky and Christine Y. Wong terminated. Xavier Brandwajn substitutes in as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/9/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teece v. Kuwait Finance House (Bahrain) B.S.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David John Teece
Represented By: Lee S. Wolosky
Represented By: Christine Y. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuwait Finance House (Bahrain) B.S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdulhakeem Al-Khayyat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adnan Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?