Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. Tractor Equipment Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James V. Canterbury, Doug Cornford, Jon Roselle, Mark Hollibush, Don Crosatto, Jose Santana, Stephen J. Mack, Bill Brunelli, James H. Beno and Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Tractor Equipment Sales, Inc., Steven E. Van Tuyl and Rena E. Van Tuyl
Case Number: 3:2013cv03703
Filed: August 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1451 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 45 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON 29 , 30 CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Summary judgment is granted for defendants Steven E. Van Tuyl and Rena E. Van Tuyl and denied for plaintiffs as against the Van Tuyls. Summary judgment is granted for plaintiffs against Tractor Equipment Sales, Inc. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/07/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2014. Case Management Conference continued to 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/02/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/03/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. Tractor Equipment Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Equipment Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Van Tuyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rena E. Van Tuyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V. Canterbury
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Cornford
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Roselle
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hollibush
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Crosatto
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Santana
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Mack
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Brunelli
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Beno
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?