Nygard International Partnership v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Nygard International Partnership
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Case Number: 3:2013cv03750
Filed: August 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Motions terminated: 33 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by Nygard International Partnership. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/10/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RESETTING HEARING. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/3/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE: Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/25/2014. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/18/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nygard International Partnership v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nygard International Partnership
Represented By: Francis Jude Torrence
Represented By: Victoria L. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?