California Business Services Center LLC v. City of Santa Rosa et al
Plaintiff: California Business Services Center LLC
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa and Jill Ravitch
Movant: City Of Gilroy
Case Number: 3:2013cv03820
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re (23 in 3:13-cv-04423-SI) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Urban PCS, LLC Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/9/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/22/14 is continued to 10/17/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/4/14., Motions terminated: (28 in 3:13-cv-03820-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Continue Case Management Conference filed by California Business Services Center LLC, (26 in 3:13-cv-03997-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Continue Case Management Conference filed by L iberty PCS, LLC, (21 in 3:13-cv-04423-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Continue Case Management Conference filed by Urban PCS, LLC, (29 in 3:13-cv-03820-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Continue Case Management Conference filed by California Business Services Center LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, Motions terminated: (23 in 3:13-cv-03820-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by California Business Services Center LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/14 is continued to 8/15/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Business Services Center LLC v. City of Santa Rosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Represented By: John Jeffrey Fritsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Ravitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Business Services Center LLC
Represented By: Matthew Kaiho Yan
Represented By: G. Scott Emblidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: City Of Gilroy
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?