Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Switzer et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Melvin J. Switzer, Sean C. Cutting and Brian Melland
Case Number: 3:2013cv03834
Filed: August 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/16/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/13/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/12/2015 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 11/9/2015. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 68 Motion to Stay (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/29/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SET ONE UNTIL AFTER THEIS COURT ISSUES AN ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY THE CIVIL PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO FILE ONE OVERLENGTH OPPOSITION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Switzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Antony S. Burt
Represented By: Nicole Sherry Kilgore
Represented By: Robert Bernard Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin J. Switzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean C. Cutting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Melland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?