Cotter v. Lyft, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Patrick Cotter
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04065
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2017 332 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 322 Motion to Intervene; denying 323 Motion for Reconsideration. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 14, 2017 331 USCA Case Number 17-15702 9th Circuit for 319 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven Price. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 14, 2017 330 USCA Case Number 17-15692 9th Circuit for 317 Notice of Appeal filed by Christine Gaussoin. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 13, 2017 329 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 326 Request for Judicial Notice, 325 Declaration in Support, 324 Declaration in Support, 328 Received Document, 322 MOTION to Intervene, 323 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Archie Overton (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 328 Received Document: Complaint for Injunctive Relief filed by Archie Overton. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 327 Received Document: LETTER dated 4/13/17 to USCA from Archie Overton. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 326 Request for Judicial Notice re 322 MOTION to Intervene, 323 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Archie Overton (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4, # 4 part 5, # 5 part 6, # 6 part 7)(Related document(s) 322 , 323 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 325 Declaration of S Mendel in Support of 322 MOTION to Intervene, 323 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Archie Overton(Related document(s) 322 , 323 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 324 DECLARATION of Archie Overton in Support of 322 MOTION to Intervene, 323 MOTION for Reconsideration filed byArchie Overton (Related document(s) 322 , 323 ) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 323 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Archie Overton. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 322 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Archie Overton. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/27/2017. Replies due by 5/4/2017. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 12, 2017 321 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 11, 2017 320 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kerry Sweeney. Appeal of Order 310 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 11, 2017 319 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Steven Price. Appeal of Order 310 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11307322 paid.) (Caiafa, Douglas) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 11, 2017 318 USCA Case Number 17-15648 9th Circuit (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 10, 2017 317 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Christine Gaussoin. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11304339 paid.) electronic service (Creamer, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 7, 2017 316 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/1/16, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2017. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
March 31, 2017 315 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by James Page. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11278468 paid.) (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 24, 2017 314 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. (Notice of Filing of Notice of Related Cases) (Dryer, Alexander) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 313 Featured Case ORDER RE: FINAL OPT-OUT LIST re: 310 . Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/24/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 23, 2017 312 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel of Corrected Final Opt-Out List (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Settlement Administrator, # 2 Proposed Order Re: Final Opt-Out List)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 16, 2017 311 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 3/16/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 16, 2017 310 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 3/16/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 14, 2017 309 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. of Firm Name And Email Address Change (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Frederick Creamer, Jr and Certificate of Service (Creamer, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 307 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Frederick Creamer, Jr (Creamer, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 13, 2017 306 LETTER dated 2/21/17 to Judge Chhabria from Thomas J. Busse. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 9, 2017 305 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Fairness Hearing held on 3/9/2017. No objections conveyed in court beyond the objections filed on the docket. Modifications to the proposed order discussed. The Court will issue a written ruling. FTR Time 10:08- 10:17. Plaintiff Attorney: Shannon Liss-Riordan and Matthew Carlson. Defendant Attorney: Alexander Dryer and Rachael Meny. Objector (Teamsters) Attorney: Lorrie Bradley.This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2017)
March 8, 2017 304 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel of Submission of Updated and Consolidated Opt-Out List (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Loree Kovach, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 22, 2017 Reset Internal Court Deadlines as to 272 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 271 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval), 265 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 10, 2017 303 Statement Re: Supplemental Notice Period and Response to Additional Objections by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Settlement Administrator, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 2, 2017 302 LETTER from Jonathan Pinney. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
February 2, 2017 301 LETTER from Christopher Patrick Lenny. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 31, 2017 299 OBJECTIONS to re 256 Order, Set Hearings Notice By Objectors of Intent to Appear At Second Fairness Hearing by Helen Hebert, Valerie R. Mitchell, Teamsters Joint Council 42, Teamsters Joint Council 7, Uber Lyft Teamsters Ride Share Alliance. (Bradley, Lorrie) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 27, 2017 300 Letter from Dean Alaric von Boerner. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 26, 2017 298 OBJECTIONS to Settlement and Attorneys' Fees by James Page. (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 24, 2017 297 OBJECTIONS to re 293 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Christine Gaussoin. (Kurilich, Matt) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 10, 2017 296 OBJECTION from Stevan Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 DOJ-FTC, HR wage-fixing guidance, # 2 TLC Industry Notice 16-27)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
December 28, 2016 295 Featured Case ORDER approving supplemental class notice. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 12/28/2016. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 28, 2016 294 RESPONSE to re 293 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Revised Supplemental Class Notice for Court Approval) by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Supplemental Class Notice)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 23, 2016 293 Featured Case ORDER RE FAIRNESS HEARING AND SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS NOTICE. Objections due by 1/31/2017 Fairness Hearing set for 3/9/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/23/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 21, 2016 292 RESPONSE to re 291 Response ( Non Motion ) by Lyft, Inc.. (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 21, 2016 291 RESPONSE to re 288 Order Re: Further Notice by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Supplemental Notice, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 21, 2016 290 LETTER from Colin Piotrowski. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 13, 2016 289 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Susan K Garea (Garea, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 288 Featured Case ORDER RE FURTHER NOTICE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/13/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 2, 2016 287 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 281 Motion for Leave to File Objection.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 2, 2016 286 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 269 Order for Opt Out Status.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 1, 2016 285 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2016 re 265 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Amir Kashanian, Helen Hebert, Angelica Rose Ferdinand, Teamsters Joint Council 7, Kelsey Tilander, Leigh-Ann Johnson, Teamsters Joint Council 42, 271 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) filed by Jeffrey Knudtson, Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel, 272 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jeffrey Knudtson, Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel, 269 MOTION filed by William Green. The Court hears oral argument and will issue written rulings on the motions. The Court hears objections from the following individuals: Andrew Yasinsac, Jimmy Young, and Colin Petrowsky (ASL Interpreters for Petrowsky: Carol-Sue Richardson and Bobbe Skiles).Total Time in Court 1 hour 20 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan and Matthew Carlson. Defendant Attorney Alexander Dryer, Thomas McInerney, Rachael Meny and James Slaughter. Objector Attorney William Green.This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/1/2016)
November 30, 2016 284 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel Submission of Objection by Sherwin Newman (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 283 REPLY (re 271 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) ) (Response to Objection by James Page) filed byPatrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 282 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 281 MOTION for Leave to File Objection filed by James Page. (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 280 OBJECTIONS to 272 Motion for Attorney's Fees by James Page. (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 11/30/2016) Modified on 12/1/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2016 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Teague Pryde Paterson Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel Robert Bonsall for Objectors and Teamsters (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 278 Featured Case ORDER RE FAIRNESS HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/30/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 29, 2016 277 REPLY (re 272 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) (Plaintiffs' Response to the Teamsters' Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) filed byPatrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 29, 2016 276 NOTICE by Steven Price of Intent to Not Appear at Fairness Hearing (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 28, 2016 275 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 272 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byAngelica Rose Ferdinand, Helen Hebert, Leigh-Ann Johnson, Amir Kashanian, Teamsters Joint Council 42, Teamsters Joint Council 7, Kelsey Tilander. (Bradley, Lorrie) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 18, 2016 274 JOINDER in Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Revised Class Action Settlement and in Plaintiffs Response to Objections filed by Lyft, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander Dryer, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 11/18/2016) Modified on 11/18/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2016 273 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS filed by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/17/2016) Modified on 11/18/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2016 272 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 12/1/2016. Replies due by 12/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 2 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 271 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) filed by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/30/2016. Replies due by 11/30/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Settlement Administrator Loree Kovach, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Green (Green, William) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 269 MOTION for Order Confirming Opt Out Status filed by William Green. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/30/2016. Replies due by 12/7/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Green, William) (Filed on 11/16/2016) Modified on 11/17/2016 (knm, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2016 268 Letter from Lorrie E. Bradley . (Bradley, Lorrie) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 10, 2016 267 Proposed Order re 265 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Angelica Rose Ferdinand, Helen Hebert, Leigh-Ann Johnson, Amir Kashanian, Teamsters Joint Council 42, Teamsters Joint Council 7, Kelsey Tilander. (Bradley, Lorrie) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 266 Declaration of Teague P. Paterson in Support of 265 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byAngelica Rose Ferdinand, Helen Hebert, Leigh-Ann Johnson, Amir Kashanian, Teamsters Joint Council 42, Teamsters Joint Council 7, Kelsey Tilander. (Related document(s) 265 ) (Bradley, Lorrie) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 265 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Angelica Rose Ferdinand, Helen Hebert, Teamsters Joint Council 42, Teamsters Joint Council 7, Leigh-Ann Johnson, Amir Kashanian, Kelsey Tilander. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/17/2016. Replies due by 11/17/2016. (Bradley, Lorrie) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 1, 2016 264 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear filed by Kerry Ann Sweeney. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 31, 2016 263 OBJECTIONS to re 256 Order, Set Hearings by Uber Lyft Teamsters Ride Share Alliance, Teamsters Joint Council 7, Teamsters Joint Council 42, Helen Hebert, Valerie R. Mitchell. (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 29, 2016 262 OBJECTIONS to re 256 Order, Set Hearings for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Steven Price. (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 10/29/2016)
October 27, 2016 261 OBJECTIONS to re 256 Order, Set Hearings and re [169) Motion for Settlement by Christine Gaussoin. (Kurilich, Matt) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
September 30, 2016 260 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement filed by James Cheney. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 23, 2016 259 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. (Notice of Filing of Notice of Related Cases) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 5, 2016 258 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. (Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding) (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 5, 2016 257 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 241 Administrative Motion to Consider Relating Cases 13-cv-4065-VC, Cotter v. Lyft, and 16-cv-3135-SK, Thornton v. Lyft.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 1, 2016 256 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Fairness Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/1/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 255 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Revised Class Notice). (Attachments: # 1 Revised Short Form Class Notice)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 29, 2016 254 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 249 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 28, 2016 253 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 213 Motion to Intervene.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 28, 2016 252 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 207 Stipulation re Amended Complaint for Settlement.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 27, 2016 251 Proposed Order re 249 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Angelica Rose Ferdinand. (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 27, 2016 250 Declaration of Teague P. Paterson in Support of 249 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byAngelica Rose Ferdinand. (Related document(s) 249 ) (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 27, 2016 249 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Angelica Rose Ferdinand. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 7/11/2016. Replies due by 7/18/2016. (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 27, 2016 248 RESPONSE (re 241 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Whether Cases Should Be Related Thornton et al. v. Lyft, Inc., Case No. 3:16-cv-3135-SK ) (Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related) filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 23, 2016 247 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 246 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 206 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 245 CLERK'S NOTICE WITHDRAWING PREVIOUS TWO CLERK'S NOTICES. Counsel was correct in setting the responsive deadline as 6/27/2016 re 241 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Whether Cases Should Be Related Thornton et al. v. Lyft, Inc., Case No. 3:16-cv-3135-SK. Responses due by 6/27/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 244 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO 241 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Whether Cases Should Be Related Thornton et al. v. Lyft, Inc., Case No. 3:16-cv-3135-SK. Responses due by 6/25/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 243 ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY- SEE DOCKET NUMBER 244 *** CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO 241 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Whether Cases Should Be Related Thornton et al. v. Lyft, Inc., Case No. 3:16-cv-3135-SK. Responses due by 6/24/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016) Modified on 6/23/2016 (knm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2016 242 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 190 Motion to Intervene.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 21, 2016 241 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Whether Cases Should Be Related Thornton et al. v. Lyft, Inc., Case No. 3:16-cv-3135-SK filed by David Thornton. Responses due by 6/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Thornton Complaint, # 2 Declaration ISO Motion to Relate, # 3 Proposed Order)(Malloy, Brian) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 20, 2016 240 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE HEARING RE MOTION TO INTERVENE scheduled for Thursday, June 23, 2016. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motion and responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 17, 2016 239 RESPONSE (re 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byRayshon Clark, Alex Zamora. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 13, 2016 238 RESPONSE to re 229 Order by Rayshon Clark, Alex Zamora. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 237 RESPONSE to re 229 Order by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristina Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Kristina Gibson, # 3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Kristina Gibson, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED version of Lyft, Inc.s Response to the Courts Order Requesting Further Briefing, # 4 UNREDACTED version of Lyft, Inc.s Response to the Courts Order Requesting Further Briefing, # 5 REDACTED version of Declaration of Kristina Gibson in Support of Lyft, Inc.'s Response to Order Requesting Further Briefing, # 6 UNREDACTED version of Declaration of Kristina Gibson in Support of Lyft, Inc.'s Response to Order Requesting Further Briefing)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 235 RESPONSE to re 229 Order - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing Regarding Zamora by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan and Exhibit A thereto)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 9, 2016 234 REPLY (re 213 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byRayshon Clark, Alex Zamora. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 9, 2016 233 LETTER dated 6/6/16 from William Brandon Marshall to Judge Chhabria. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 7, 2016 232 RESPONSE to re 228 Response ( Non Motion ), Re: Zamora "Phase II" Allegations by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, and Exhibits A-F thereto)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 231 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/02/16 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by Lyft, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 230 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE HEARING RE 190 MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by Angelica Rose Ferdinand. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the filings regarding this motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 6, 2016 229 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Hon. Vince Chhabria on 6/6/2016. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 6, 2016 228 RESPONSE to Zamora Plaintiffs' Submission of Documents Regarding Lyft's Prime Time Premium Practices by Rayshon Clark, Alex Zamora. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 6, 2016 227 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 2, 2016, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, email address joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 225 Transcript Order, 224 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2016. (Related documents(s) 225 , 224 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 3, 2016 226 RESPONSE to LYFT, Inc.'s Submission of Documents Regarding Prime Time Pricing by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 225 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/2/2016 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by Rayshon Clark, Alex Zamora, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 224 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/2/16 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel, for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 2, 2016 223 Declaration of Rachael E. Meny in Support of 222 Opposition/Response to Motion to Intervene filed byLyft, Inc.. (Related document(s) 222 ) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
June 2, 2016 222 RESPONSE (re 213 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byLyft, Inc.. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
June 2, 2016 221 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2016 re 206 MOTION for Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Order to issue. FTR Time 10:05 - 11:05. Plaintiff Attorneys: Matthew David Carlson; Shannon Liss-Riordan. Defendant Attorneys: R. James Slaughter; Rachael Meny; Alexander Dryer; Simona A. Agnolucci; Tom McInerney; Intervenor Attorney: Jahan C. Sagafi. Attachment: Minute Order.This is a text only Minute Entry (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2016) Modified on 6/3/2016 to include intervenor attorney. (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2016 220 RESPONSE (re 213 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 219 RESPONSE to re 218 Order Re Oral Argument by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 218 Featured Case ORDER RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/1/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 24, 2016 217 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria re 214 Administrative Motion re Briefing Schedule and Hearing.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 23, 2016 216 RESPONSE (re 214 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re Briefing Schedule and Hearing re 213 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byLyft, Inc.. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 23, 2016 215 RESPONSE (re 214 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re Briefing Schedule and Hearing re 213 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 19, 2016 214 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re Briefing Schedule and Hearing re 213 MOTION to Intervene filed by Alex Zamora, Rayshon Clark. Responses due by 5/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 5/19/2016) Modified on 5/20/2016 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2016 213 MOTION to Intervene filed by Alex Zamora, Rayshon Clark. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 6/2/2016. Replies due by 6/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi, # 2 Exhibit A-D, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 5/19/2016) Modified on 5/20/2016 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2016 212 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 209 Motion to Relate Cases 13-cv-4065-VC, Cotter v. Lyft and 16-cv-2558-KAW, Zamora v. Lyft.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 17, 2016 211 RESPONSE (re 209 MOTION to Relate Case by Plaintiffs in Zamora v. Lyft, Inc. ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 210 RESPONSE (re 209 MOTION to Relate Case by Plaintiffs in Zamora v. Lyft, Inc. ) (Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related) filed byLyft, Inc.. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 13, 2016 209 MOTION to Relate Case by Plaintiffs in Zamora v. Lyft, Inc. filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jahan C. Sagafi, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 208 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 205 Motion to Shorten Time.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 11, 2016 207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amended Complaint for Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 206 MOTION for Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/25/2016. Replies due by 6/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Settlement Agreement and Exhibits Thereto), # 2 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 205 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Revised Class Action Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
April 13, 2016 204 REPLY (re 190 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene ) filed byAngelica Rose Ferdinand. (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 12, 2016 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Settlement Conference held on 4/12/2016. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order.(ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2016)
April 11, 2016 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Davis Berry (Berry, Brian) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 7, 2016 201 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING RE 190 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 7, 2016 200 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 169 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 6, 2016 199 Joinder re 198 Joinder DEFENDANT'S AMENDED JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE TEAMSTERS' AND OBJECTORS' MOTION TO INTERVENE by Lyft, Inc.. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 198 Joinder re 195 Opposition/Response to Motion, DEFENDANTS JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE TEAMSTERS AND OBJECTORS MOTION TO INTERVENE by Lyft, Inc.. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 197 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew David Carlson (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 1, 2016 196 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/20016, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 10:08 a.m. - 1:01 p.m. = 162 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 194 Transcript Order, 193 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2016. (Related documents(s) 194 , 193 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 31, 2016 195 RESPONSE (re 190 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 25, 2016 194 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/16 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by Lyft, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 193 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/24/16 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 24, 2016 192 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2016 re 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. The Court heard argument from counsel and the objector. A member of the audience is interested in objecting to the proposed settlement. The Court grants their request to file a written objection by close of business 3/25/2016.FTR Time 10:08- 12:00 and 12:11- 1:01. Plaintiff Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan and Matthew Carlson. Defendant Attorney James Slaughter, Rachael Meny, Thomas McInerney and Alexander Dryer. Objector Attorney Costa Keresteniz and Susan Garea.This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2016)
March 23, 2016 191 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Complaints-In-Intervention by Angelica Rose Ferdinand. (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 23, 2016 190 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene filed by Angelica Rose Ferdinand. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/6/2016. Replies due by 4/13/2016. (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 22, 2016 189 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 187 Motion for Administrative Relief to File Overlength Brief.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 188 REPLY (re 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 187 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Overlength Brief filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 3/24/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan, # 2 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 17, 2016 186 Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci in Support of 185 Brief filed byLyft, Inc.. (Related document(s) 185 ) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 185 Brief Regarding Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byLyft, Inc.. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 184 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Time of Hearing back to 10:00 AM as to 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 183 Featured Case ORDER by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 182 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING THE TIME OF THE HEARING RE 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 15, 2016 181 Declaration of Teague P. Paterson in Support of 180 Opposition/Response to Motion, Objections to Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement filed byAngelica Rose Ferdinand. (Related document(s) 180 ) (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 180 RESPONSE (re 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) Objection to Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement filed byAngelica Rose Ferdinand. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 179 Declaration of William Hartman in Support of 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing Re: Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byLyft, Inc.. (Related document(s) 178 ) (Dryer, Alexander) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 10, 2016 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing Re: Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 177 Supplemental Brief Re: Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
February 18, 2016 176 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Zachary W Shine and Notice of Appearance (Shine, Zachary) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 17, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Responses due by 3/10/2016. Replies due by 3/17/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 175 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 173 Stipulation re Supplemental Briefing Schedule.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 16, 2016 174 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC 176 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Thomas Michael McInerney and Notice of Appearance (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 2/16/2016) Modified on 2/19/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2016 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Supplemental Briefing Schedule filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 11, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Responses due by 2/25/2016. Replies due by 3/3/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 11, 2016 172 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Hon. Vince Chhabria on 2/11/16. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
January 28, 2016 171 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 168 Motion for Administrative Relief to File Overlength Brief.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 26, 2016 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Amended Complaint for Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 169 MOTION for Settlement / Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 2/9/2016. Replies due by 2/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 3 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 168 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Overlength Brief (Unopposed) filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 2/9/2016. Replies due by 2/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 13, 2016 167 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF THE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION. Motions due by 1/26/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 4, 2016 166 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 10, 2015 165 Featured Case CORRECTED ORDER re 164 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/10/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 1/19/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 164 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 163 Stipulation Re Class Certification Briefing Schedule.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 8, 2015 163 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 2, 2015 162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further telephonic settlement discussions held on 11/2/2015. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 161 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Settlement Conference held on 10/30/2015. Parties to email information to Judge Ryu by 5:00 p.m. on 11/2/2015. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order.(ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2015)
October 28, 2015 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Elizabeth Meny re SIMONA A. AGNOLUCCI (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Elizabeth Meny (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 16, 2015 158 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 81 Motion Hearing,, ), by Patrick Cotter. Court will send to Erin O'Reilly at eoreilly@llrlaw.com a link to the files requested in this order. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 13, 2015 157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Settlement Conference held on 10/13/2015. Parties shall provide copies of correspondence related to 10/30/2015 proceedings to Judge Ryu via email. Further Settlement Conference set for 10/30/2015 02:00 PM. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2015)
October 7, 2015 156 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
August 17, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 11/20/2015. Motions due by 12/8/2015. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 17, 2015 155 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 152 Stipulation Re Class Certification Discovery Cutoff and Class Certification Briefing Schedule.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 17, 2015 154 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 151 Plaintiffs' Motion to be excused from personal attendance and be allowed to participate by telephone at Further Settlement Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015) Modified on 8/17/2015 (ig, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2015 153 Proposed Order re 151 REQUEST to be Excused from Personal Attendance at Further Settlement Conference by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 14, 2015 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Class Certification Discovery Cutoff and Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 12, 2015 151 REQUEST to be Excused from Personal Attendance at Further Settlement Conference by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel re 150 Order Setting Settlement Conference (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/14/2015 (farS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 150 Order Setting Further Settlement Conference: Further Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/10/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 5, 2015 149 Letter from Rachael E. Meny (Joint) to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 3, 2015 148 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended) byLyft, Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 147 FOLLOW-UP CLERK'S NOTICE: Per Clerk's Notice issued on 7/27/15 [Docket #145], the parties were previously instructed to contact Judge Ryu's Courtroom Deputy with a proposed dates in September (except Sept 21-30) and October. Instead of contacting Judge Ryu's Courtroom Deputy, by no later than 8/7/2015, the parties shall e-file a joint letter to Judge Ryu providing at least 4 proposed dates for setting of the Further Settlement Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015) . Modified on 7/31/2015 (igS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2015 145 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Further Settlement Conference previously scheduled for 7/31/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu has been VACATED. The parties shall contact Judge Ryu's Courtroom Deputy at (510) 637-3639 with proposed dates in September (except Sept 21-30) and October.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015).
July 24, 2015 146 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 146 , SETTLEMENT MINUTE ORDER WAS ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED IN THE WRONG CASE. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further telephonic settlement discussions held 7/20/2015 and 7/24/2015. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2015) Modified on 7/27/2015 (ig, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2015 144 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc.. Filed byAlejandra Maciel, Patrick Cotter. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 15, 2015 143 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 137 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 13, 2015 142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 7/13/2015. Further conference tentatively scheduled for 7/31/2015 10:00 AM. Counsel to confirm by 7/24/2015 via email, cc:ing Judge Ryu. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2015)
July 9, 2015 141 ERRATA re 140 Reply to Opposition/Response by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 8, 2015 140 REPLY (re 137 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 1, 2015 139 RESPONSE (re 137 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ) DEFENDANT LYFT INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YBARRA IN SUPPORT OF LYFTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO YBARRA DECLARATION, # 3 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH GALLAGHER)(Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 29, 2015 Set Deadlines as to 137 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint as counsel did not calendar properly in ECF. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 19, 2015 138 Order Setting Further Settlement Conference: Further Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2015 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/19/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 17, 2015 137 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 16, 2015 136 Order granting 135 Stipulation Re Class Certification Briefing Schedule.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 12, 2015 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 11, 2015 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further telephonic settlement discussions held on 6/11/2015. Parties shall contact Judge Ryu by 6/16/2015 with response re future scheduling. See minute Order for more particulars. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2015)
June 9, 2015 133 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 10:03-10:35 held on 06/04/2015, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Transcriber Kelly Polvi, Telephone number 503.779.7406; email kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 10:03-10:35. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 130 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2015. (Related documents(s) 130 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 5, 2015 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 6/5/2015. Telephone Conference set for 6/11/2015 02:00 PM (Pacific Time) before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Defense counsel shall arrange for the call, and shall provide call-in number for Judge Ryu. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2015)
June 4, 2015 131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lyft, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 130 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Patrick Cotter for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 129 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 118 Motion to Enjoin State Court Litigation. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2015 re 118 MOTION to Stay or Enjoin State Court Action or, in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and/or Modify Scheduling Order filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion to Stay/Enjoin is denied. Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel is denied. Motion to Modify Scheduling Order is denied. The Court will issue a written ruling. Plaintiff requests the Court strike interested party counsel notice of appearance; the Court does not rule on this matter at this time. FTR Time 10:03- 10:35. Plaintiff Attorney Shannon-Liss Riordan and Matthew Carlson. Defendant Attorney Rachael Meny. Interested Party Attorney Christopher Morosoff not present, only listening by phone. This is a text only Minute Entry. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2015)
May 21, 2015 127 REPLY (re 118 MOTION to Stay or Enjoin State Court Action or, in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and/or Modify Scheduling Order ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 20, 2015 126 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ALEX SANTANA AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT LYFT, INC. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 18, 2015 125 RESPONSE (re 118 MOTION to Stay or Enjoin State Court Action or, in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and/or Modify Scheduling Order ) State Court Plaintiff and Interested Party Steven Price's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enjoin or Stay State Court Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed bySteven Price. (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 18, 2015 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Caiafa (Caiafa, Douglas) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 18, 2015 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Morosoff as counsel for Interested Party Steven Price (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 14, 2015 122 Declaration of MICHELLE YBARRA in Support of 121 Opposition/Response to Motion, DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YBARRA IN SUPPORT OF LYFT'S PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENJOIN OR STAY STATE COURT ACTION filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 121 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 121 RESPONSE (re 118 MOTION to Stay or Enjoin State Court Action or, in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and/or Modify Scheduling Order ) LYFT'S PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENJOIN OR STAY STATE COURT ACTION filed byLyft, Inc.. (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 8, 2015 120 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. OF WITHDRAWAL (Punak, Rebekah) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 1, 2015 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Sabrina Ybarra (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 30, 2015 118 MOTION to Stay or Enjoin State Court Action or, in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and/or Modify Scheduling Order filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/14/2015. Replies due by 5/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson in Support, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 6 Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan in Support, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan, # 8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan, # 9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan, # 10 Exhibit D to Declaration of Shannon-Liss Riordan)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 27, 2015 117 Featured Case ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 116 Plaintiffs' Amended Request to be excused from personal attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/27/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 24, 2015 116 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel re 112 Order Setting Settlement Conference Amended Request to be Excused from Personal Attendance at the Parties' Settlement Conference (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 24, 2015 115 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference rescheduled to 6/5/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/24/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 17, 2015 114 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel re 112 Order Setting Settlement Conference Request to be Excused from Personal Attendance at the Parties' Settlement Conference (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 17, 2015 113 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel re 112 Order Setting Settlement Conference Joint Notice of Unavailability for Settlement Conference (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 14, 2015 112 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/14/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 10, 2015 111 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 04/10/2015. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 9, 2015 110 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. The parties must provide the Court with a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the hearing. Discovery relating to class certification due by 9/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/9/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 7, 2015 109 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lyft, Inc. Pursuant to L.R. 3-16 (Amended) (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 3, 2015 108 OBJECTIONS to re 106 Notice (Other) (Objection and Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Scheduling) by Lyft, Inc.. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 3, 2015 107 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lyft, Inc. [AMENDED] (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 3, 2015 106 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel of Supplemental Authority Regarding Scheduling (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 31, 2015 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Initial Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 3/31/2015. The Court will issue an order regarding these proceedings. Not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan and Matthew Carlson. Defendant Attorney Thomas McInerney, Rachael Meny, James Slaughter, Kristin Sverchek (in-house), and Loni Mahanta (in-house). This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/31/2015)
March 24, 2015 104 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [JOINT] filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 19, 2015 103 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING THE TIME FOR THE TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/31/2015: Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Previous order, dkt. no. 95 has the correct time, entered incorrectly in ECF.) Plaintiff counsel is directed to provide the Court and opposing counsel a telephone conference line with applicable access code by no later than 3/25/2015. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 13, 2015 102 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson Re: Resubmission of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Liability Previously Sought to be Filed Under Seal filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B1, # 2 Exhibit I1, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit TTT)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Barnes Dryer (Dryer, Alexander) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Leigh Punak (Punak, Rebekah) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Slaughter (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Elizabeth Meny (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 97 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria finding as moot 90 Administrative Motion to File Notice of New Authority.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 96 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 95 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/12/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 11, 2015 94 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 6, 2015 93 RESPONSE (re 90 MOTION Administrative to File Notice of New Authority ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 3, 2015 92 Proposed Order re 90 MOTION Administrative to File Notice of New Authority , 91 Declaration in Support of Defendant Lyft Inc's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Notice of New Authority [Local Rule 7-11] by Lyft, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 3, 2015 91 Declaration in Support of 90 MOTION Administrative to File Notice of New Authority filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 90 ) (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 3, 2015 90 MOTION Administrative to File Notice of New Authority filed by Lyft, Inc.. Responses due by 3/17/2015. Replies due by 3/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 B)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
February 17, 2015 89 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 84 Motion to File Notice of New Authority.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 10, 2015 88 Proposed Order re 87 Opposition/Response to Motion for Administrative Relief to File Notice of New Authority by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 87 RESPONSE (re 84 MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 9, 2015 86 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/29/2015, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 11:08 a.m. - 12:38 p.m. = 90 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 6, 2015 85 Declaration of Alex Santana in Support of 84 MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY filed byLyft, Inc.. (Related document(s) 84 ) (Santana, Alex) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 6, 2015 84 MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY filed by Lyft, Inc.. Responses due by 2/20/2015. Replies due by 2/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 4, 2015 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Patrick Cotter for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 3, 2015 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lyft, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 29, 2015 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2015 re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lyft, Inc., and 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. The Court will issue an order with its ruling. FTR Time 11:08- 12:38. Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Carlson and Shannon Liss-Riordan. Defendant Attorney Thomas McInerney, Christopher Ahearn, and Alex Santana. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2015)
January 14, 2015 80 REPLY (re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability ) filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Santana in Support)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 7, 2015 79 REPLY (re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Matthew D. Carlson, # 2 Exhibit UUU to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 3 Exhibit VVV to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 4 Exhibit WWW to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 5 Exhibit XXX to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 6 Exhibit YYY to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 7 Exhibit ZZZ to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 8 Exhibit AAAA to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 9 Exhibit BBBB to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 10 Exhibit CCCC to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 11 Exhibit DDDD to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 12 Exhibit EEEE to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 13 Declaration of Gary Freedline)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 22, 2014 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lyft, Inc. re 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal SELECTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PATRICK COTTER AND ALEJANDRA MACIEL; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 77 Declaration of KOMAL KIRTIKAR in Support of 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 76 Declaration of Alex Santana in Support of 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C part 1 of 3, # 5 Exhibit C part 2 of 3, # 6 Exhibit C part 3 of 3, # 7 Exhibit D part 1 of 3, # 8 Exhibit D part 2 of 3, # 9 Exhibit D part 3 of 3, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 75 Request for Judicial Notice re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byLyft, Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lyft, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 1/5/2015. Replies due by 1/12/2015. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal SELECTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PATRICK COTTER AND ALEJANDRA MACIEL; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit B part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit B part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit B part 1 of 2 - Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit B part 2 of 2 - Under Seal)(Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 5, 2014 72 Declaration of Alex Santana in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed byLyft, Inc.. (Santana, Alex) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 1, 2014 71 Request for Judicial Notice re 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson in Support, # 2 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 69 ) (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson in Support, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit I1, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit TTT, # 7 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 12/22/2014. Replies due by 1/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson in Support, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU, # 48 Exhibit VV, # 49 Exhibit WW, # 50 Exhibit XX, # 51 Exhibit YY, # 52 Exhibit ZZ, # 53 Exhibit AAA, # 54 Exhibit BBB, # 55 Exhibit CCC, # 56 Exhibit DDD, # 57 Exhibit EEE, # 58 Exhibit FFF, # 59 Exhibit GGG, # 60 Exhibit HHH, # 61 Exhibit III, # 62 Exhibit JJJ, # 63 Exhibit KKK, # 64 Exhibit LLL, # 65 Exhibit MMM, # 66 Exhibit NNN, # 67 Exhibit OOO, # 68 Exhibit PPP, # 69 Exhibit QQQ, # 70 Exhibit RRR, # 71 Exhibit SSS)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 10, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEGING SCHEDULE: Plaintiff's Motion due by 12/1/2014. Defendant's Cross Motion due by 12/22/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/7/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 6, 2014 67 RESPONSE (re 64 Administrative Motion Regarding Its Motion for Summary Judgment Briefing ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 5, 2014 66 Proposed Order re 64 Administrative Motion Regarding Its Motion for Summary Judgment Briefing by Lyft, Inc. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/5/2014) Modified on 11/6/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 65 Declaration of Thomas M. McInerney in Support of 64 Administrative Motion Regarding Its Motion for Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Lyft, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to McInerney Declaration)(Related document(s) 64 ) (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/5/2014) Modified on 11/6/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 64 Administrative Motion Regarding Its Motion for Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Lyft, Inc. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/5/2014) Modified on 11/6/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 63 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 9/23/2014), ***Motion Denied: 59 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Lyft, Inc. Discovery due by 11/14/2014. Motions due by 12/1/2014. (Not reported or recorded.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2014)
September 22, 2014 62 RESPONSE (re 59 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint ) filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 16, 2014 61 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Santana, Alex) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 60 ANSWER to 55 Third Amended Complaint by Lyft, Inc. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 59 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Lyft, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/29/2014. Replies due by 10/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Santana in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Santana, Alex) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 11, 2014 58 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
August 29, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 57 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 56 Motion for Leave to Appeal, and scheduling case management conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 28, 2014 56 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Review filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/11/2014. Replies due by 9/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 28, 2014 55 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc.. Filed by Alejandra Maciel, Patrick Cotter. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2014 54 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 06/26/14, before Judge Vince Chhabria. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 11:49 - 12:46. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 52 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014. (Related documents(s) 52 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2014)
August 14, 2014 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Patrick Cotter for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 11, 2014 52 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lyft, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 7, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER STRIKING CLASS ALLEGATION. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/7/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
July 25, 2014 50 NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
June 26, 2014 49 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing (Date Filed: 6/26/2014). (FTR Recording: 11:49- 12:46.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 48 NOTICE by Patrick Cotter of Withdrawal of Appearance of John Duke (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 23, 2014 47 AMENDED DECLARATION of Matthew D. Carlson in Support of 45 Plaintiffs' Brief Re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2014 46 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING THE LOCATION OF THE OSC HEARING: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/26/2014 10:30 AM Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 12, 2014 45 Brief re 42 Order to Show Cause Re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed byPatrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Carlson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 42 ) (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 44 Brief re 42 Order, 43 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, BRIEF BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC. IN REPONSE TO THE MAY 23, 2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher M. Ahearn)(Related document(s) 42 , 43 ) (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
May 27, 2014 43 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/23/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 5/27/2014). Discovery due by 11/17/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2014. Show Cause Response due by 6/12/2014. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/26/2014 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/23/14. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 12, 2014 41 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 2, 2014 40 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Lyft, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 29, 2014 39 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 38 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 27, 2014 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for a Protective Order filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 4/27/2014)
April 17, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable Vince Chhabria, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/17/14. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 9, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Duke representing Plaintiffs. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shannon Liss-Riordan representing Plaintiffs. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014) Modified on 4/9/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8513512.) filed by Patrick Cotter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Duke, John) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8513511.) filed by Patrick Cotter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 1, 2014 33 CLERKS NOTICE : Per the Order granting the Joint Stipulation, Dkt. No. 32 the correct Deadline to file letter requesting pre-filing conference concerning motions for summary judgment/adjudication as to name Plaintiffs' individual claims is May 30, 2014 (not 5/20). (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Phase I Discovery due by 5/16/2014; Phase II Discovery cutoff is 9/12/14. Deadline to Conduct Mediation 8/22/14. Deadline to file class certification Motions is 9/12/2014. Letter requesting pre-filing conference re summary judgment deadline is 5/30/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) Modified on 4/1/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 31 Stipulation Regarding Discovery and Scheduling. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 26, 2014 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Discovery and Scheduling, filed by Lyft, Inc., Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 3/26/2014) Modified on 3/27/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2014 30 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing James Nebel as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 10, 2014 29 Answer to 28 Second Amended Complaint, filed by Lyft, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 1/10/2014) Modified on 1/13/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2013 28 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc.. Filed by Alejandra Maciel, Patrick Cotter. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 26 Stipulation re: Filing of Second Amended Complaint. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 20, 2013 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Filing of Second Amended Complaint, filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel, Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2013 25 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 9, 2013 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/9/2013 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 12/9/2013), Case referred to ADR for Court mediation to be completed by 4/21/14. Non-Expert Discovery cutoff is 6/6/14. (Recording #FTR 2:56pm-3:05pm and 3:11pm-3:17pm.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/19/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2013 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Lyft, Inc., Alejandra Maciel, Patrick Cotter. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 12/2/2013) Modified on 12/3/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2013 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lyft, Inc. Or Persons Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 21 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Lyft, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/25/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2013 20 Answer to Amended Complaint re 10 Amended Complaint, filed by Lyft, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/25/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2013 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation, filed by Lyft, Inc., Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel filed by Lyft, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/25/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2013 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cotter Certification) (Attachments: # 1 Maciel Certification)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Michael McInerney of Alex Santana (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Michael McInerney (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 19, 2013 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel Re: YGR Standing Order (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 12 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 16, 2013 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 11/16/2013)
November 4, 2013 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc.. Filed by Patrick Cotter, Alejandra Maciel. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 11/4/2013) Modified on 11/5/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2013 9 STIPULATION Regarding Amended Complaint and Response to Amended Complaint, filed by Lyft, Inc., Patrick Cotter. (Ahearn, Christopher) (Filed on 11/4/2013) Modified on 11/5/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2013 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patrick Cotter. Service waived by Lyft, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2013, answer due 11/4/2013. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 11, 2013 7 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2013 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
September 6, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/6/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (File on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/9/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 4, 2013 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Cotter.. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2013 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 3, 2013 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 3, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-7970191.). Filed byPatrick Cotter. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotter v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Cotter
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?