Khazal v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Rebecca Khazal
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04076
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATED REQUEST AND ORDER FOR THE COURT TO FILL IN MISSING TERMS IN LONG-FORM SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT, granting 59 STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/16/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 45 Motion for Settlement; finding as moot 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 55 Stipulation (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re motion to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/19/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 24 Notice (Other) filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/29/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Notice (Other). Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2014 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/28/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014) Modified on 7/28/2014 (nahS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/28/2014 (nahS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of dismissal. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/30/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 17 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/16/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/23/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khazal v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Khazal
Represented By: Pieter Bogaards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Emily Eschenbach Barker
Represented By: Laura J. Maechtlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?