Mitchell v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: S.R. Mitchell
Defendant: One West Bank FSB, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Regional Service Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv04212
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE REINSTATMENT OF REGIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION AS A DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE ACCIDENTAL DISMISSAL OF REGIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 13, 2014. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/27/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank FSB
Represented By: Mark Jeremy Seifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Mark Jeremy Seifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Service Corporation
Represented By: Magdalena D. Kozinska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.R. Mitchell
Represented By: S. Raye Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?