Adetuyi v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Dickson Adetuyi
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2013cv04273
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/7/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REQUESTING CLARIFICATION. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE DECLARATION BY 7/17/2014 AT 3:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/16/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Discovery Order re: 24 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Dickson Adetuyi. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/21/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adetuyi v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Rafal Ofierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dickson Adetuyi
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?