Indiezone, Inc. et al v. Rooke et al
Plaintiff: eoBuy, Limited and Indiezone, Inc.
Defendant: General Electric, Walmart, US Bank, Tony Abena, Dave Moorehouse, II, Dan Frawley, Chris Ohlsen, Justin James, Shannon Davis, Music.Me LLC, Jingit Financial Services, LLC, Jingit Holdings, LLC, Holly Oliver, Sam Ashkar, Phil Hazel, Joe Rogness, Todd Rooke, Target, Chris Karls, Jingit LLC and John E. Fleming
Case Number: 3:2013cv04280
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration.(vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/2/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 134 Motion for Recusal. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 132 Motion for Order to Show Cause and Ordering Production of Exhibits by Monday, August 4th, at noon PST. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 29 Motion to Compel; granting 35 Motion to Dismiss; granting 35 Motion to Stay; denying 57 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting 76 Motion to Dismiss; denying 84 Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying 90 Motion to Amend/Correct (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING: Exhibit List due by 7/17/2014. Witness List due by 7/17/2014. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/6/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re 101 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines - Counsel for Indiezone, Inc. and EoBuy, Ltd., are also included in this Stipulation filed by Chris Ohlsen, Mus ic.Me LLC, Tony Abena, Holly Oliver, Sam Ashkar, Dave Moorehouse, II, Phil Hazel, Jingit Holdings, LLC, Jingit LLC, Jingit Financial Services, LLC, Todd Rooke, Joe Rogness, John E. Fleming, Justin James, Chris Karls, US Bank, Targe t, Wal-Mart, Shannon Davis, General Electric, Dan Frawley. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/30/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers and Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/2/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiezone, Inc. et al v. Rooke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Abena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Moorehouse, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ohlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music.Me LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingit Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingit Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Ashkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Hazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Rogness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Rooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Karls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingit LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eoBuy, Limited
Represented By: Douglas Richard Dollinger
Represented By: Seth David Heyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiezone, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Richard Dollinger
Represented By: Seth David Heyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?