July 2, 2018 |
Filing
143
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 142 Stipulation filed by Robert Figy, Mary Swearingen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
|
March 14, 2018 |
Filing
141
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Private Mediation filed by Late July Snacks LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
|
January 31, 2018 |
Filing
139
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 138 (Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation) filed by Late July Snacks LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/31/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing
130
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 128 Continuing CMC filed by Late July Snacks LLC Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing
123
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Robert Figy, Mary Swearingen. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2017. Further Ca se Management Conference set for 9/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/28/2017. Replies due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
|
June 9, 2017 |
Filing
120
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 119 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Third Amended Complaint filed by Late July Snacks LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
116
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying In Part 101 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
|
November 1, 2016 |
Filing
106
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 12/16/2016. Replies due by 1/16/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 2/16/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
|
July 22, 2016 |
Filing
98
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER LIFTING STAY, SETTING SCHEDULE, AND ADJOURNING CMC filed by Late July Snacks LLC Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/17/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
|
June 10, 2016 |
Filing
95
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 continuing CMC filed by Late July Snacks LLC. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
|
April 22, 2016 |
Filing
91
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Further CMC set for 9/8/16 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
|
March 25, 2016 |
Filing
88
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Late July Snacks LLC Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
86
ORDER Regarding Food and Drug Administration Action and Referral to Commissioner. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
83
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2015. Further Case Management Conference sreet for 10/15/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
78
ORDER Regarding Food and Drug Administration Action and Referral to Commissioner. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing
74
ORDER re 72 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Late July Snacks LLC resetting Further Case Management Conference for 5/14/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
|
November 10, 2014 |
Filing
71
ORDER RESETTING CMC re 70 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Late July Snacks LLC Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
69
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying in Part 32 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
|
April 25, 2014 |
Filing
64
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 RESETTING CMC filed by Late July Snacks LLC Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/19/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
62
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Clerks Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Late July Snacks LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Cle rks Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, , 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing reset for 5/22/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
|
February 14, 2014 |
Filing
46
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Briefing Schedule and Case Management Conference filed by Robert Figy, Mary Swearingen, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Briefi ng Schedule and Case Management Conference, 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6). Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2014 10:30 AM in Court room 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 3/4/2014. Replies due by 3/25/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/14/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
|
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
29
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 26 Amended Complaint Extending Time for Def. Late July Snacks to Respond filed by Late July Snacks LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/2/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
|
October 25, 2013 |
Filing
12
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 9/23/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
|