McErlain v. Park Plaza Towers Owners Association et al
Plaintiff: Nancy McErlain
Defendant: Park Plaza Towers Owners Association, David Behling and Behling Property Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv04384
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2015 Filing 99 STIPULATION STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Nancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER VACATING EXISTING DEADLINES AND DATES; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. The Court vacates all existing deadlines and dates, including the trial date, and directs the parties to file, no later than February 13, 2015, a Joint Status Report, if a dismissal has not been filed prior to said date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 17, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE by Nancy McErlain NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES. The deadline for fact discovery related to Park Plaza Towers Owners Association is extended to December 19, 2014. The deadline to designate experts, as to Park Plaza Towers Owners Association, is extended to December 5, 2014, and the deadline for expert discovery cutoff date, as to Park Plaza Towers Owners Association, is extended to January 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DEEMING STIPULATION WITHDRAWN. The stipulation is deemed withdrawn in light of the parties' joint request, made at the November 14, 2014 Status Conference, for an extension of greater length. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Further Status Conference held on 11/14/2014. (Date Filed: 11/14/2014)Individual Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 1/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time FTR: 11:21 to 11:54. Plaintiff Attorney Robert Howie, Jr., Patricia Wendleton. Defendant Attorney Natalie Vance. Attachment Civil Pretrial Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF)
November 13, 2014 Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Nancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2014.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING IN PART AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER; VACATING HEARING. The August 12, 2014 order is vacated to the extent plaintiff's claims against the Association were thereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Further Status Conference set for 11/14/2014 10:30 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 89 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Nancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 11/7/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 Filing 88 Supplemental Brief in support of #66 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Related document(s) #66 ) (Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 11/5/2014) Modified on 11/6/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 Filing 87 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON #60 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 11/5/2014) Modified on 11/6/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court will reset the hearing date, as appropriate, after determining whether the Court is required to abstain. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER AFFORDING PARTIES LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; CONTINUING HEARING. The parties shall file any supplemental brief no later than November 5, 2014, limited to five pages in length. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is continued to November 14, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (85 in 3:13-cv-03232-MMC) First MOTION for Reconsideration of August 12, 2014 Order of Dismissal, (60 in 3:13-cv-04384-MMC) MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Supplemental Responses due by 11/5/2014. Motion Hearing re-set to 11/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 84 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON GLENN PRATT IN SUPPORT OF #60 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Pratt Supplemental Declaration, #2 Supplement SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, #3 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2014) Modified on 10/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2014 Filing 83 REPLY to #81 Response/Opposition (re #68 Second MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation. (Miller, Jerry Scott) (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/28/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2014 Filing 82 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF #81 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 Exhibit 2 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)(Related document(s) #81 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/20/2014) Modified on 10/21/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2014 Filing 81 RESPONSE/Opposition (re #68 Second MOTION to Dismiss ) COMPLAINT (FRCP 12(c)) filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT)(Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/20/2014) Modified on 10/21/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. The expert discovery cutoff is extended from October 24, 2014 to November 14, 2014 solely for the purpose of completing the expert depositions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 17, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 79 REPLY to #70 Response (re #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 10/15/2014) Modified on 10/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2014 Filing 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Expert Discovery Deadline filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 77 REPLY to #65 Response (re #60 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed byNancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/10/2014) Modified on 10/14/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Filing 76 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF #70 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DAVID BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 Exhibit 2 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #3 Exhibit 3 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #4 Exhibit 4 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #5 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 10/9/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Filing 75 Declaration of WILLIAM R. TATOMER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF #70 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DAVID BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 10/9/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Filing 74 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF #70 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DAVID BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TO NANCY McERLAIN'S DECLARATION)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 10/9/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Filing 73 DECLARATION OF ROBERT HOWIE IN SUPPORT OF #70 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DAVID BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TO HOWIE DEC, #2 Exhibit B TO HOWIE DEC, #3 Exhibit C TO HOWIE DEC, #4 Exhibit D TO HOWIE DEC)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 10/9/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Filing 72 EXHIBITS re #70 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, EXHIBITS 41 TO 58 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON GLENN PRATT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DAVID BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42 to Pratt Dec., #2 Exhibit 43 to Pratt Dec., #3 Exhibit 44 to Pratt Dec., #4 Exhibit 45 to Pratt Dec., #5 Exhibit 46 to Pratt Dec., #6 Exhibit 47 to Pratt Dec., #7 Exhibit 48 to Pratt Dec., #8 Exhibit 49 to Pratt Dec., #9 Exhibit 50 to Pratt Dec., #10 Exhibit 51 to Pratt Dec., #11 Exhibit 52 to Pratt Dec., #12 Exhibit 53 to Pratt Dec., #13 Exhibit 54 to Pratt Dec., #14 Exhibit 55 to Pratt Dec., #15 Exhibit 56 to Pratt Dec., #16 Exhibit 57 to Pratt Dec., #17 Exhibit 58 to Pratt Dec.)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 71 EXHIBITS re #70 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, EXHIBITS 21 TO 40 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHARON GLENN PRATT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22 to Pratt Dec., #2 Exhibit 23 to Pratt Dec., #3 Exhibit 24 to Pratt Dec., #4 Exhibit 25 to Pratt Dec., #5 Exhibit 26 to Pratt Dec., #6 Exhibit 27 to Pratt Dec., #7 Exhibit 28 to Pratt Dec., #8 Exhibit 29 to Pratt Dec., #9 Exhibit 30 to Pratt Dec., #10 Exhibit 31 to Pratt Dec., #11 Exhibit 32 to Pratt Dec., #12 Exhibit 33 to Pratt Dec., #13 Exhibit 34 to Pratt Dec., #14 Exhibit 35 to Pratt Dec., #15 Exhibit 36 to Pratt Dec., #16 Exhibit 37 to Pratt Dec., #17 Exhibit 38 to Pratt Dec., #18 Exhibit 39 to Pratt Dec., #19 Exhibit 40 to Pratt Dec.)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 70 RESPONSE (re #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DAVID BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF SHARON IN GLENN PRATT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS BEHLING AND BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, #2 Exhibit 1 to Pratt Dec., #3 Exhibit 2 to Pratt Dec., #4 Exhibit 3 to Pratt Dec., #5 Exhibit 4 to Pratt Dec., #6 Exhibit 5 to Pratt Dec., #7 Exhibit 6 to Pratt Dec., #8 Exhibit 7 to Pratt Dec., #9 Exhibit 8 to Pratt Dec., #10 Exhibit 9 to Pratt Dec., #11 Exhibit 10 to Pratt Dec., #12 Exhibit 11 to Pratt Dec., #13 Exhibit 12 to Pratt Dec., #14 Exhibit 13 to Pratt Dec., #15 Exhibit 14 to Pratt Dec., #16 Exhibit 14 to Pratt Dec., #17 Exhibit 16 to Pratt Dec., #18 Exhibit 17 to Pratt Dec., #19 Exhibit 18 to Pratt Dec., #20 Exhibit 19 to Pratt Dec., #21 Exhibit 20 to Pratt Dec.)(Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 69 Request for Judicial Notice re #68 Second MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Related document(s) #68 ) (Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 68 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/20/2014. Replies due by 10/27/2014. (Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 67 Request for Judicial Notice re #66 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-I)(Related document(s) #66 ) (Miller, Jerry Scott) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 66 Amended RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ) AMENDED RESPONSE filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Miller, Jerry Scott) (Filed on 10/3/2014) Modified on 10/6/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2014 Filing 65 RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ) filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation. (Miller, Jerry Scott) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 64 Request for Judicial Notice re #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D through W, #2 Exhibit X through NN)(Related document(s) #63 ) (Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Summary Adjudication filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/8/2014. Replies due by 10/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Behling, #2 Declaration Lindsey N. Heaton, #3 Declaration Steve Starr, #4 Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/25/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #60 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Responses due by 10/3/2014. Replies due by 10/10/2014. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 62 Request for Judicial Notice re #60 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 Exhibit 2 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #3 Exhibit 3 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 61 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF #60 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt In Support of Plaintiff' Nancy McErlain's Motion for Reconsideration of August 12, 2014 Order Granting Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 9/19/2014) Modified on 9/22/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Nancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 59 Notice of Withdrawal of #51 Motion for entry of judgment. (Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Modified on 9/17/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Related Case to 13-3232 MMC by Nancy McErlain. (Howie, Robert) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Filing 57 RESPONSE (re #51 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ) PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PARK PLAZA TOWERS OWNERS ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Park Plaza Towers Owners Association Motion for Entry of Judgment)(Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. To the extent the motion seeks leave to file a motion for reconsideration of the August 12, 2014 order, the motion is granted, and plaintiff is directed to file her motion for reconsideration no later than September 19, 2014. To the extent the motion seeks an order certifying the August 12, 2014 order as appropriate for interlocutory appeal, the motion is denied as premature. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 55 Request for Judicial Notice re #53 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 Exhibit 2 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)(Related document(s) #53 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 9/2/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2014 Filing 54 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation. (Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 53 PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Nancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF SHARON GLENN PRATT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NANCY McERLAIN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AUGUST 12, 2014 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)(Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 9/2/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT PARK PLAZA TOWERS OWNERS ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/12/2014. Replies due by 9/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 50 Declaration of Natalie P. Vance in Support of #49 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Related document(s) #49 ) (Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 27, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 9/10/2014. Replies due by 9/17/2014. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS by Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/10/2014. Replies due by 9/17/2014. (Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 8/27/2014) Modified on 8/28/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2014 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF #49 PARK PLAZA TOWERS OWNERS ASSOCIATIONS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS MOTION filed by Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/10/2014. Replies due by 9/17/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 8/27/2014) Modified on 8/28/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER; VACATING HEARING; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. To the extent defendants seek leave to amend their answer of behalf of all defendants other than the HOA, the motion is granted. To the extent defendants seek leave to amend their answer on behalf of the HOA, the motion is denied as moot. Defendants are directed to file their amended answer no later than September 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 20, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER EXTENDING NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATE AND USE OF DEPOSITIONS TAKEN IN STATE COURT. The non-expert discovery cutoff date is extended from August 25, 2014 to September 30, 2014 solely for the purpose of completing the non-expert depositions previously noticed by the parties. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATE AND USE OF DEPOSITIONS TAKEN IN STATE CASE filed by Nancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; VACATING HEARING. To the extent the motion seeks judgment on the pleadings in favor of the HOA, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 43 RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Complaint ) PLAINTIFF NANCY MCERLAIN'S STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND/CORRECT ANSWER (L.R. 7-3 (b)) filed byNancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 42 REPLY (re #37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Miller, Jerry Scott) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Scott Miller (Miller, Jerry Scott) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Complaint filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/8/2014. Replies due by 8/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 39 DECLARATION OF SHARON GLENN PRATT IN RESPONSE TO #37 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(c) filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Exhibit Q, #16 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) #38 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 7/22/2014) Modified on 7/23/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2014 Filing 38 RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings pusuant to FRCP 12(c) ) filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick McErlain In Response to Defendants' Motion for Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant to FRCP 12(c), with attached Exhibit K and Exhibit M, #2 Declaration Declaration of Nancy McErlain In Response To Defendants' Motion for Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c), #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order On Defendants' Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c))(Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 7/22/2014) Modified on 7/23/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/22/2014. Replies due by 7/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie P. Vance (Vance, Natalie) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Natalie P. Vance and Lindsey N. Heaton of Klinedinst PC are substituted as counsel for defendants in place and in stead of Michael B. Allen Law Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lindsey Nicole Heaton (Heaton, Lindsey) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: USE OF STATE COURT RECORDS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 30 REPLY to #25 Opposition (re #17 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ) filed byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Ex. A RJN, #3 Exhibit Ex, B RJN, #4 Exhibit Objection to Evidence Submitted in Opposition)(Allen, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF NANCY MCERLAIN'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF #25 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD & FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Nancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Filing 28 DECLARATION OF PATRICK MCERLAIN IN OPPOSITION TO #17 DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD & FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W to Declaration of Patrick McErlain)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Filing 27 DECLARATION OF NANCY MCERLAIN IN OPPOSITION TO #17 DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD & FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O to Declaration of Nancy McErlain, #2 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Nancy McErlain, #3 Exhibit V to Declaration of Nancy McErlain)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Filing 26 DECLARATION OF SHARON GLENN PRATT IN SUPPORT OF #25 PLAINTIFF NANCY MCERLAIN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #8 Exhibit H to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #9 Exhibit I to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #10 Exhibit J to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #11 Exhibit K to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #12 Exhibit L to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #13 Exhibit M to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #14 Exhibit N to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #15 Exhibit P to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #16 Exhibit R to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #17 Exhibit S to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt, #18 Exhibit T to Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Filing 25 RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed byNancy McErlain. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 19, 2013 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 12/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 12/19/2013). (Digital FTR Recording:12:37-12:48) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING THE TELPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING TIME ONLY: Discovery Hearing reset to 12/19/2013 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The case is referred for discovery to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC Discovery Hearing for 12/19/2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS. The hearing on the motions to strike is continued from January 3, 2014 to January 24, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. In C-13-04384, plaintiff's opposition shall be filed and served on January 7, 2014, and defendants' reply shall be filed and served on January 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Responses due by 1/7/2014. Replies due by 1/14/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS filed by Nancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon Glenn Pratt)(Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/16/2013. Replies due by 12/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Supplement MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF GRANT H. BAKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit GHB Ex A, #4 Exhibit GHB Ex B, #5 Exhibit GHB Ex C, #6 Exhibit GHB Ex D, #7 Exhibit GHB Ex E, #8 Exhibit GHB Ex F, #9 Exhibit GHB Ex G, #10 Exhibit GHB Ex H, #11 Exhibit GHB Ex I, #12 Exhibit GHB Ex J (1), #13 Exhibit GHB Ex J (2), #14 Exhibit GHB Ex K, #15 Exhibit GHB Ex L, #16 Exhibit GHB Ex M, #17 Exhibit GHB Ex N, #18 Exhibit GHB Ex O, #19 Supplement DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND, THIRD, AND FOURTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, #20 Exhibit RJN Ex A, #21 Exhibit RJN Ex B, #22 Exhibit RJN Ex C (1), #23 Exhibit RJN Ex C (2), #24 Exhibit RJN Ex D, #25 Exhibit RJN Ex E, #26 Exhibit RJN Ex F, #27 Exhibit RJN Ex G, #28 Exhibit RJN Ex H, #29 Exhibit RJN Ex I, #30 Exhibit RJN Ex J, #31 Exhibit RJN Ex K, #32 Exhibit RJN Ex L (1), #33 Exhibit RJN Ex L (2), #34 Exhibit RJN Ex M (1), #35 Exhibit RJN Ex M (2), #36 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #37 Certificate/Proof of Service POS)(Allen, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Allen, Michael) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE INITIAL DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 22, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FRCP 26(f) filed by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Allen, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 14, 2013 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT [FRCP 26(f)]. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 11 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 5, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Jury Selection set for 2/9/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/5/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 9 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/1/2013 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 11/5/2013). Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2014 10:30 AM. () (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association re #7 Answer. (Allen, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 Filing 7 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS:1) PARK PLAZA TOWERS OWNERS ASSOCIATION; 2) DAVID BEHLING; and 3) BEHLING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION TO COMPLAINT byDavid Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association. (Allen, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 25, 2013 Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney #6 . Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER. McErlain v. Park Plaza Towers Owners Association, C 13-3232, is related to McErlain v. Park Plaza Towers Owners Association, C 13-4384. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 24, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy McErlain.. (Pratt, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2013 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Behling, Behling Property Management Corporation, Park Plaza Towers Owners Association (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt # 34611089893.) SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed byNancy McErlain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McErlain v. Park Plaza Towers Owners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Plaza Towers Owners Association
Represented By: Grant Harlan Baker
Represented By: Jerry Scott Miller
Represented By: Michael Blanchard Allen
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Casillas
Represented By: Assaad Michel Stephan
Represented By: Natalie P. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Behling
Represented By: Grant Harlan Baker
Represented By: Jerry Scott Miller
Represented By: Michael Blanchard Allen
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Casillas
Represented By: Assaad Michel Stephan
Represented By: Natalie P. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behling Property Management Corporation
Represented By: Grant Harlan Baker
Represented By: Jerry Scott Miller
Represented By: Michael Blanchard Allen
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Casillas
Represented By: Assaad Michel Stephan
Represented By: Natalie P. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy McErlain
Represented By: Sharon Glenn Pratt
Represented By: Robert George Howie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?