Bastidas v. Good Samaritan Hospital LP et al
Plaintiff: J. Augusto Bastidas
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital LP, Good Samaritan Hospital LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff, HCA Inc., Steven M. Schwartz and Bruce G. Wilbur
Case Number: 3:2013cv04388
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 VERDICT FORM (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER for Jury Refreshments. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE 218 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 176 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION TO CHANGE TIME. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/2916. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 144 .(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER, Motions terminated: 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Vacate All Trial and Pretrial Dates, Extend Briefing Deadlines, and Schedule Case Management Conference) filed by Steven M. Schwartz, Good Sa maritan Hospital LP, Bruce G. Wilbur, Samaritan LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Ilston on 1/26/16. (with Judicial signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER, Motions terminated: 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Vacate All Trial and Pretrial Dates, Extend Briefing Deadlines, and Schedule Case Management Conference) filed by Steven M. Sch wartz, Good Samaritan Hospital LP, Bruce G. Wilbur, Samaritan LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Ilston on 1/26/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 117 118 121 127 131 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER, Motions terminated: 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates and [Proposed] Order filed by J. Augusto Bastidas. Jury Selection set for 2/29/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 2/29/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/29/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER, Motions terminated: 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions and Continue Related Deadlines filed by Steven M. Schwartz, Good Samaritan Hospital LP, Bruce G. Wilbur, Samaritan LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/7/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 3/26/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/17/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 84 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER, Motions terminated: 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference filed by Steven M. Schwartz, Good Samaritan Hospital LP, Bruce G. Wilbur, Samaritan LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/14 is continued to 12/12/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/10/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER, Motions terminated: 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference and Set Briefing Schedule on Amended Complaint filed by Good Samaritan Hospital LP, Good Samaritan Hospital LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS 63 64 65 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER, Motions terminated: 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 68 Clerks Notice, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference Scheduled for July 11, 2014 and Set a New Date filed by Steve n M. Schwartz, HCA Inc., Good Samaritan Hospital LP, Bruce G. Wilbur, Samaritan LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital LLC, Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/14 is continued to 7/25/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 61 Stipulation STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO 60 Amended Complaint (Second) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER, Motions terminated: 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference filed by HCA Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/14 is continued to 6/6/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/18/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 41 42 43 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS 24 25 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/14 is continued to 3/21/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/16/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/23/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bastidas v. Good Samaritan Hospital LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Augusto Bastidas
Represented By: James A. Hennefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce G. Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?