The Estate of Mohammed Shah et al v. City of Hayward et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Mohammed Shah, Janifer Shah and Valerie Weaver
Defendant: City of Hayward
Case Number: 3:2013cv04516
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/15/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT, ALLEN NEULA WITH PREJUDICE: Re 115 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by C.E.W. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/12/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: Re 113 Notice (Other) filed by C.E.W. Counsel shall file a stipulated dismissal or a Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 11/12/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/1/2015. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. In thinking about the final instructions and the verdict form, claims one and three are the same claim. The court asks the parties to confer about whether it makes sense to proceed only one of the claims, either by a stipulation that the pl aintiffs will do so or by a stipulated amended complaint. The court attaches a revised preliminary instruction 1.2 (because a version of it will serve as an introduction to the section 1983 claims). The chronology for the jury in the final instructions and the verdict form should be the Fourth Amendment claim, the Fourteenth Amendment claim, and the state claims. It might make sense to conform the pleadings to that approach. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PRETRIAL ORDER (attached). By September 17, 2015 (1) the defendant must specify the specific documents (convictions, contacts, and medical treatment records) that he will introduce (see discussion regarding the plaintiffs' MIL 1) and (2) the parties must file Dr. Gustin's report (see discussion regarding the plaintiffs' MIL 2). The parties must confer about the exhibits as discussed in Section VIII and file an updated exhibit list by September 23, 2015 that reflects their progress as of that date. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Jury Trial set for October 5, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference set for September 3, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/18/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: The court calendared this case for trial but accidentally double set it with another case that is going to trial. The court thus resets the trial one week earlier to July 27, 2015. The attached order sets forth the dat es, including the dates for filing pretrial papers. The court also sets a short Case Management Conference for June 18, 2015, at 11: a.m., which should be after the parties' next settlement conference with Judge Westmore and before they file th eir pretrial papers. A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 6/11/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 7/27/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/20 15 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/28/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/29/2015 a t 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/30/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/31/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/12/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Re 51 Stipulation filed by City of Hayward, Allen Neula. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/9/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 15 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 7 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Mohammed Shah et al v. City of Hayward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Mohammed Shah
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janifer Shah
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Weaver
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hayward
Represented By: Rafael Enrique Alvarado, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?