Habeas Corpus Resource Center et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Habeas Corpus Resource Center and Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Arizona
Defendant: United States Department of Justice and Eric H. Holder
Case Number: 3:2013cv04517
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/29/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 63 Stipulation VOLUNTARILY DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ESTABLISH SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON REMAINING CLAIMS (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 61 Stipulation TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/4/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 29 MOTION TO INTERVENE AND GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/22/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/15/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 27 Stipulation for Briefing on Show Cause Order 26 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING 7 PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. (Denying 13 Motion to Stay). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING THE HEARING ON EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habeas Corpus Resource Center et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: George E. Greer
Represented By: Shannon Christine Leong
Represented By: Catherine Yunshan Lui
Represented By: Marc R Shapiro
Represented By: Darren S. Teshima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Arizona
Represented By: George E. Greer
Represented By: Shannon Christine Leong
Represented By: Catherine Yunshan Lui
Represented By: Marc R Shapiro
Represented By: Darren S. Teshima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Jacqueline E. Coleman Snead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder
Represented By: Jacqueline E. Coleman Snead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?