TVIIM, LLC v. McAfee, Inc.
Plaintiff: TVIIM, LLC
Defendant: McAfee, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04545
Filed: October 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 305 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND NEW TRIAL AND GRANTING IN PART 294 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 319 Stipulation Requesting Permission to Connect Laptops for Visual Presentations at November 12, 2015 Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 309 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER GRANTING 311 JOINT REQUEST TO SET NEW HEARING DATE FOR POST-TRIAL re 305 , 294 MOTIONS : Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/14/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 303 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 296 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/6/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Transcripts (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. OVERRULING Defendant's objections to Plaintiff's expert witness demonstratives and GRANTING 252 Defendant's administrative motion to file under seal. (hsglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2015)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SECOND AMENDED 241 ORDER FOR JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/15/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 AMENDED 238 ORDER FOR JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/10/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (terminating 167 Motion in Limine; 233 Stipulation) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 225 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of William A. Rudy. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 112 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and DENYING 120 Motion for Summary Judgment (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER SEALING CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/23/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER SEALING CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/19/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER SEALING CERTAIN DOCUMENTS AND DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT HIGHLIGHTED UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/17/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ( 161 , 163 , 164 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ( 114 , 118 , 128 , 130 , and 137 )MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 150 Stipulation Requesting Permission To Connect Laptops For Visual Presentations at May 13, 2015 Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Haywod S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 147 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 98 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 99 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Mukherji.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 91 Stipulation to Extend Time to Complete Mediation.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 71 Motion to Shorten Time.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Tallon.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 65 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 50 Discovery Letter Brief. The parties shall, within 21 days, file a stipulated protective order consistent with this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Banks.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 39 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/9/14. (Filed on 5/9/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by TVIIM, LLC filed by TVIIM, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TVIIM, LLC v. McAfee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TVIIM, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Harrison Grant
Represented By: John Joseph Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAfee, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Carol Capuyan
Represented By: Richard Goldenberg
Represented By: Joseph J. Mueller
Represented By: Sarah B Petty
Represented By: Katherine D. Prescott
Represented By: Michael Wolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?