Castillo v. Lowe's HIW, Inc.

Plaintiff: Edward Castillo
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04590
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Class and Representative Claims. Motion Hearing reset for 11/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/04/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 20, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Unredacted Document. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/20/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 21, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Hearing on motion to compel arbitration and to dismiss class and representative claims. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/21/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
January 28, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/28/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request for Extension for 41 Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/27/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Castillo
Represented By: Trung Thi Nguyen
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim
Represented By: Phillip J. Eskenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.