Kalani v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Ilda Kalani
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv04591
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for an Extension of Time filed by Carolyn Colvin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
April 22, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY THE COURT IF SHE CONSENTS OR DECLINES TO ASSIGNMENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Consent or Decline by 5/6/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 22, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
May 6, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn Colvin. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/06/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
March 18, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. The action is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalani v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilda Kalani
Represented By: Tom F. Weathered
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.