Jimenez et al v. County of Alameda

Plaintiff: Leilani Jimenez, J.J., D.J. and Dennis Jimenez, Jr.
Defendant: County of Alameda
Case Number: 3:2013cv04620
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUMMARYJUDGMENT IN PART AND DENYINGSUMMARY JUDGMENT IN PART by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016).
April 22, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting: 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING DATE FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, RESETTING DATES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DEPOSITIONS AND SETTING DATES FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING FOR MOTION filed by J. Cesena, et al. Reset Deadlines as to 61 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication. Supplemental Responses due by 7/8/2016. Supplemental Replies due by 7/22/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 8/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/20/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
February 11, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re SECOND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR TIME TO COMPLETE ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY. Court vacates the summary judgment hearing and sets a CMC. Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charlels R. Breyer on 2/11/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 1, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SECOND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR TIME TO COMPLETE ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY by Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
December 4, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing continued to 2/19/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/4/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
October 14, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 Proposed Order FOR DEPOSITION OF LEON EVANS, filed by Dennis Jimenez, Jr., et al.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/14/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 5, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 24, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Second Stipulation to Continue by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015).
September 16, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Time to Complete Additional Discovery by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
August 3, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Dennis Jimenez, Jr., et al. Reset Deadlines as to 35 MOT ION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing and Further Case Management Conference reset for 9/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Supplemental Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2015.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/3/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
November 26, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE BY ONE WEEK filed by County of Alameda. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/26/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez et al v. County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Jimenez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.J.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Jimenez, Jr.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?