Figy v. Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert E. Figy
Defendant: Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04828
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to the Parties' Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal. It is Hereby Ordered: The Court hereby dismisses this case without prejudice, and such dismissal will convert to a dismissal with prejudice twenty (20) days from the Court's Order; and Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/11/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Regarding 61 Motions to Dismiss and Strike; 62 Request For Judicial Notice. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 8/16/2016. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing on Recent FDA Guidance. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 6/2/16. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/16)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on Lifeway Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 61 MOTION to Dismiss And Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/21/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing Date and Deadlines as to 61 MOTION to Dismiss And Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 2/23/2016. Replies due by 3/1/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/04/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Lifting Stay. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 01/04/16. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/14/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER continuing case management conference. Case management conference set for 4/20/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint statement due 4/13/2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/20/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER vacating hearing and setting case management conference. Case management statement due by 1/19/2015. Case management conference set for 1/26/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/2014. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 24 Defendant's Motion to Stay Case. The 05/12/14 Motion Hearing is VACATED. The Case Management Conferene set for 06/09/14 is Vacated. Per the Order, the Compliance Hearing on the stay is set for 11/03/14 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. The pre-hearing joint statement shall be due no later than 10/13/14. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/05/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/08/14. Motion Hearing re-set for 5/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing and Re-Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/20/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing and Related Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Responses due by 2/14/2014. Replies due by 2/21/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/29/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figy v. Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Figy
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: John Keith Hyde
Represented By: D'Juana Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?