Halim v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia Halim
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04854
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DIRECTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO TO SERVE PLAINTIFF BY 12/18/2013 AND FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY 12/19/2013. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2014.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/16/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013) Modified on 12/16/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/10/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Striking 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halim v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Halim
Represented By: Gregory Michael Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?