Wagner v. Digital Publishing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Wagner
Defendant: Digital Publishing Corporation, Juniper Marketing LLC, Mediactivate LLC, On Demand Research LLC, Prime Advertisers LLC, Serve Clicks LLC, Spire Vision Holdings, Inc., Ward Media Inc., XL Marketing Corporation, Achieve Opportunities, Agreewizard, Furturesdrive, Junctionlights, Opportunity Central, Paths Direct, Pullsmart, Youradshere, Accelerize New Media Inc., Adconian Media Inc., Adharmonics Inc., Everydayfamily Inc., Insite Marketing Group LLC, Leadrival LP, Lifescript Inc., Zulu Marketing LLC and Spire Vision LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv04952
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTINGJOINT STIPULATION TO VOLUNTARYDISMISSAL OF ACTION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/5/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/27/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/5/2015. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING 89 STIPULATION TO BRIEFLY CONTINUE TRIAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING 57 SECOND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND VACATING HEARING. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014).
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DISCOVERY REGARDING CONSENT AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/11/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014).
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CONTINUING HEARING re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] as to Four Spams. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2014 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/11/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RESCHEDULING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HEARING FOR AUGUST 14 re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] as to Four Spams filed by Christopher Wagner, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] as to Four Spams. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2014 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/5/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 THIRD ORDER RE DIVERSITY JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/22/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DIVERSITY JURISDICTION AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] as to Four Spams. Show Cause Response due by 7/18/2014. Reply Briefs due 7/21/2014. Motion Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment set for 8/21/2014 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/12/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] as to Four Spams filed by Christopher Wagner. Responses due by 7/3/2014. Replies due by 7/10/2014. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2014 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/19/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DEEMING CASES UNRELATED.Court declines to deem the cases related. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 13-00054. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/6/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND VACATING HEARING re 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Non-Preemption filed by Christopher Wagner, 44 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Christopher Wagner (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING HEARING re 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Non-Preemption filed by Christopher Wagner. Signed by Judge William Alsup on February 26, 2014. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE RE ACCELERIZE NEW MEDIA, INC. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/21/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/12/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JURISDICTION AND DEFERRING RULING ON PLAINTIFFS PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2013 08:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/11/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/9/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Digital Publishing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wagner
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Publishing Corporation
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Marketing LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediactivate LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Demand Research LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Advertisers LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serve Clicks LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spire Vision Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Media Inc.
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Marketing Corporation
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Achieve Opportunities
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agreewizard
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furturesdrive
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junctionlights
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opportunity Central
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paths Direct
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pullsmart
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youradshere
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelerize New Media Inc.
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adconian Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adharmonics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everydayfamily Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insite Marketing Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leadrival LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifescript Inc.
Represented By: Kevan A. Fornasero
Represented By: Jim McCullagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zulu Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spire Vision LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?