Petzilla, Inc. v. Anser Innovation LLC
Plaintiff: Petzilla, Inc.
Defendant: Anser Innovation LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv05067
Filed: October 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Petzilla, Inc. The Clerk shall close this file. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/18/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/4/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This court issues the instant OSC requiring that Plaintiff, no later than 2/28/2014, either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on defendant; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/19/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/2/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petzilla, Inc. v. Anser Innovation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anser Innovation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petzilla, Inc.
Represented By: Kieun Sung-Ikegami
Represented By: Nicolas Spiros Gikkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?