White v. Demaray et al
Plaintiff: Christopher D. White
Defendant: Demaray LLC, Richard E. Demaray and Antropy Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2013cv05169
Filed: November 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Court will hold a case management conference on August 12, 2014, at 10:00 am. The parties shall file a joint case management statement no later than August 5, 2014. The parties shall advise the Court if they reach a final settlement agreement before the case management conference.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. The deadline for Defendant's responsive pleading is extended to 07/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The parties shall file a joint case management statement by 07/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 05/20/2014. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION MODIFYING TIME FOR FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/6/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION Allowing Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint filed by Christopher D. White. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/11/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 5 Motion to Dismiss; granting 6 Motion to Strike (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Demaray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demaray LLC
Represented By: Jason Michael Gonder
Represented By: Glenn Edward Westreich, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Demaray
Represented By: Jason Michael Gonder
Represented By: Glenn Edward Westreich, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antropy Incorporated
Represented By: Jason Michael Gonder
Represented By: Glenn Edward Westreich, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D. White
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Sugerman
Represented By: Geoffrey Gordon-Creed
Represented By: Charlie Yenchang Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?