Guo v. 8bo.com et al

Defendant: 8bo.com, 5123.com, 16688.com, boti.com and huati.com
Plaintiff: Danni Guo and Jiawei Lu
Case Number: 3:2013cv05299
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 47 , 53 Service of Process, Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment, and Objections to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/17/2015. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
December 31, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE 41 . Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/31/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
August 13, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED Motion to Continue Case Management Conference 33 . Case Management Conference set for 10:00 AM on 10/22/2014 in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/13/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 4, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION RE 29 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/4/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
June 20, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE 26 . Further Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/20/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 6, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 16 Motion to Waive Service by Postal Mail and Publication. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
April 18, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING; CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on April 18, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
March 21, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE 18 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/21/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guo v. 8bo.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8bo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5123.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16688.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: boti.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huati.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danni Guo
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Rodenbaugh
Represented By: Erin Dennis Vivion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiawei Lu
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Rodenbaugh
Represented By: Erin Dennis Vivion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?