Villanueva v. Morpho Detection, Inc
Plaintiff: Harold Villanueva
Defendant: Morpho Detection, Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv05390
Filed: November 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/22/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 69 , 70 , 71 ) MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ENHANCEMENT AWARD.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Stipulation FOR SCHEDULE FOR CLASS NOTICE AND SETTING FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr granting 62 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.(hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 52 ) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER[AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/11/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villanueva v. Morpho Detection, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morpho Detection, Inc
Represented By: Michael David Schlemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Villanueva
Represented By: Leonard Thomas Emma
Represented By: Michael Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Noel Ilg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?