Schmeck v. Chappell

Petitioner: Mark Lindsey Schmeck
Respondent: Kevin Chappell
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:2013cv05415
Filed: November 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court (DISREGARD - ORDER REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT. SEE DOC 78) ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO SEAL. Any future pleadings relating to Sealed Claim 1 must be filed under seal. The Clerk is hereby directed to remove ECF Dkt. No. 65 from the public docket and place under seal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/3/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016) Modified on 8/4/2016 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 54 CONTINUING DATE FOR MOTION AND JOINT STATEMENT ON EXHAUSTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 16, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
January 9, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL, Attorney Wesley Andrew Van Winkle,Brian Marc Pomerantz for Mark Lindsey Schmeck added.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/9/15. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmeck v. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Lindsey Schmeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?