Dunn v. Teachers Insurance & Annuity Association of America, A New York Entity et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Dunn
Defendant: Teachers Insurance & Annuity Association of America and Experis US, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05456
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/2/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 224 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 228 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 226 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 219 SETTLEMENT APPROVAL( terminated as moot 222 Administrative Motion) Motions due by 5/26/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 SCHEDULING ORDER re Docket No. 213 : Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2017;. Close of Fact and Expert Discovery due by 4/3/2017; Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/24/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE 211 MOTION FOR JOHN M. PADILLA TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 208 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 199 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Further Case Management Conference on September 6, 2016. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 196 MOTION FOR GABRIEL ASSAAD TO PARTICIPATE TELEPHONICALLY AT THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 194 MOTION FOR JOHN M. PADILLA TO PARTICIPATE TELEPHONICALLY AT THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 181 , 191 ) SETTLEMENT APPROVAL; SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 183 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Gabriel Assaad. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Revised Settlement Agreement (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 157 SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND DENYING 166 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS by Haywood S Gilliam, Jr denying 143 Motion for Settlement.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 150 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting 138 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Edward Spang; Christopher Anthony Killens and Michael Ross Phillips terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/19/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 AMENDED ORDER RESETTING CMC re 124 Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 3/5/15 to 1/22/15 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING re 116 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9094037.) filed by Pride Technologies, LLC. Court system updated to reflect Attorney McAlphine is admitted in this Court. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE: GOSS DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/25/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 103 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Pride Technologies, LLC, Experis US, Inc., Teachers Insurance & Annuity Association of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 91 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation on Extension of Time for Defendant Pride Technologies, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint filed by Pride Technologies, LLC, 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation on Extension of Time for Defendant Pride Technologies, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint [Proposed] Order Granting Extension of Time</ filed by Pride Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 56 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Pride Technologies, LLC. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 48 Proposed Order, filed by Pride Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Teachers Insurance & Annuity Association of America, A New York Entity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers Insurance & Annuity Association of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experis US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Dunn
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?