J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Ramirez
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Marco Percy Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2013cv05561
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/10/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Ex Parte Application Continuing the Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/25/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/18/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Percy Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?