J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Sahagun et al

Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Martin Gutierrez Marquez, Jose Diaz Sahagun and Marisa Food Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05620
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AGAINST JOSE DIAZ SAHAGUN AND D/B/A FERNANDO'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT; AND MARISA FOOD SERVICES, INC., D/B/A FERNANDO'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/30/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014) Modified on 12/30/2014 (knm, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria finding as moot 38 Motion to Appear by Telephone with instruction to counsel.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 24 Motion for Default Judgment (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, For an Order Changing Time on: (1) Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; and (2) Case Management Conference filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Sahagun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Gutierrez Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Diaz Sahagun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Food Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?