J & J Sports Production, Inc. v. Torres

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Production, Inc.
Defendant: Franco Torres
Case Number: 3:2013cv05644
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause; denying 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; and dismissing case. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/2014. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER resetting CMC from 3/27/14 to 6/5/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/14. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Production, Inc. v. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Production, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franco Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?