Lazarte v. Velocity Express et al
Plaintiff: Elsa Lazarte
Defendant: Velocity Express and Velocity Express Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05654
Filed: December 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of this cause, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims alleged against defendants herein be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety (90) days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying Motion to Relate Case (Docket 184 in case 3:12-cv-05790-JST). Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 5, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. The order to show cause is discharged as to defendants. Plaintiff is afforded leave to file, no later than July 31, 2015, a supplement to her response. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE; DIRECTING PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. The Further Status Conference is continued to August 14, 2015, at 10:30 a.m.; the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than August 7, 2015. Plaintiff and defendants are directed to show cause, separately, in writing, and no later than July 2, 2015, why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES Various deadlines are modified. The trial in this action is continued from October 13, 2015 to March 21, 2016, no earlier date being available. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/15/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. The Case Management Conference is continued to August 15, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than August 8, 2014. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on the two recently served defendants and to file proof of such service no later than July 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 11, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than July 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 29, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 21, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL, ANSWER, AND OTHER FILINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. Nathanael Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/4/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lazarte v. Velocity Express et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Lazarte
Represented By: Daniel Martinez de la Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Express Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Reins Pohls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?