Adams v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frank Avilla, Tammy Bradley, Troy Joseph, Suzanne Fried, Christine Brenner, David Adams, Pamela Cail, Kathy Carlson, Kenny Gill, Ernie Cail, Julie Beebe, Jennifer Anderson, Teresa Cooper, Kimberly Cook, Melissa Carothers-Brooker, Lawrence Baerman, Lori Baerman, Sharon Berndt, Regina Collins, James Brown, Bill Bressler, Robert Justice, Edna Copenhaver, Marisa Garner, Steven Elrick, Rebecca Dean, Brenda Biggers, Maurya Gill, Loretta Arzaga, Max Day, Vicki Fredrick, Jessica Foster, Kalista Cook, James Cooper, Christopher Cook, Robert Beebe, Denise Adams, Devaney Covington, Jeanette Ballato, Freddy Copenhaver, Dorothea Bressler, Thomas Carlson, Donald Dean, Kristin Avilla, Dick Brooker, Kathy Gindler, Joe Czekalski, Linda Barkwell, Benjamin Vinson, Victor Ballato, Terry Cook, Eve Brown, Lori Day, Carolyn Catoe, Julie Brown, Sharon Goodwyn, Elizabeth Carroll, Rebecca Delsignore, Christie Banford, Teresa Czekalski, Roy Fried, Chanin Elrick and Jason Anderson
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, Coloplast Corporation, Ethicon, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05795
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2014 This action is e-transferred to USDC for the Southern District of West Virginia ( 2:14-cv-00586, filed 01/07/2014.) (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-144) to the USDC for the Southern District of West Virginia (MDL NO. 2325). Signed by Judge Jeffrey N. Luthi on 1/7/14. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston signed on 12/23/13granting #13 Stipulation to stay case pending MDL decision to transfer. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Medical Systems, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Combs, Lynn) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/14 is continued to 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. THIS IS A DOCKET TEXT ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision to Transfer to MDL No. 2325, In Re American Medical Systems, INc., Pelvic Repair System Products Litigation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #12 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision to Transfer to MDL No. 2325, In Re American Medical Systems, INc., Pelvic Repair System Products Litigation filed by Ethicon, Inc.. (Childers, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Notice of Motion and Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision to Transfer to MDL No. 2325, In Re American Medical Systems, INc., Pelvic Repair System Products Litigation filed by Ethicon, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/3/2014. Replies due by 1/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Motion to Stay, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of to Stay, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Stay, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Motion to Stay, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Motion to Stay, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Michelle A. Childers in Support of Motion to Stay)(Childers, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Hon. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/19/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on December 18, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Medical Systems, Inc... (Combs, Lynn) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 13, 2013 Answer to Removal Complaint #2 by American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, C.R. Bard, Inc., Ethicon, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by American Medical Systems, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Medical Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Corporate Parent American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Endo Health Solutions, Inc. for American Medical Systems, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 2 Declaration of Lynn A. Combs in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Related document(s) #1 ) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #1 part 2) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #2 part 3, #3 part 4) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #4 part 5, #5 part 6, #6 part 7) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #7 part 8) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #8 part 9, #9 part 10, #10 part 11) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #11 part 12) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #12 part 13) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #13 part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 part 16) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #16 part 17, #17 part 18) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #18 part 19, #19 part 20) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #20 part 21, #21 part 22, #22 part 23, #23 part 24) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #24 part 25, #25 part 26) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #26 part 27) (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #27 Exhibits B - H) (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no process) (jury demand by both) from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG13687231. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt No. 34611092169). Filed by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Avilla
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Bradley
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Joseph
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Fried
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Brenner
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Adams
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Cail
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Carlson
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Gill
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Cail
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Beebe
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anderson
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Cooper
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cook
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Carothers-Brooker
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Baerman
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Baerman
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Berndt
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Collins
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Bressler
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Justice
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Copenhaver
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Garner
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Elrick
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Dean
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Biggers
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurya Gill
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Arzaga
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Day
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Fredrick
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Foster
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalista Cook
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cooper
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cook
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Beebe
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Adams
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devaney Covington
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Ballato
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Copenhaver
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Bressler
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Carlson
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dean
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Avilla
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dick Brooker
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Gindler
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Czekalski
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Barkwell
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vinson
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ballato
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Cook
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Brown
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Day
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Catoe
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Brown
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Goodwyn
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Carroll
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Delsignore
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Banford
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Czekalski
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Fried
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanin Elrick
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Anderson
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Represented By: Dylan Franklin Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: J. David Bickham
Represented By: Lynn Ann Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Brian Patrick Ziska
Represented By: Lael Awong Vaughn
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Corporation
Represented By: Tarifa B Laddon
Represented By: Jan Eve Dodd
Represented By: Lesley Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Sally Francis White
Represented By: Michelle A Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin George Lohman
Represented By: Michael Kevin Brown
Represented By: Eric John Buhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?