Bell v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Keith Bell
Defendant: Ken Lee, Krol, Gatman, DeLos Reyes, Herrion, Ward, Murillo, Weatherly and Pescador
Case Number: 3:2013cv05820
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE: (1) STAY AND (2) DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE (1) MOTION TO QUASH, (2) APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, AND (3) IN CAMERA REVIEW 91 94 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum issued for Plaintiff's presence at the settlement conference on 7/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/24/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017) Modified on 3/24/2017 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/5/2016. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND MISCELLANEOUS MATTERS 29 31 20 25 27 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER 10 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Keith Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeLos Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pescador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?