Kirk v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Jennifer Kirk
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv05885
Filed: December 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. IN RE: TARGET CORPORATION CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION, MDL No. 2522. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel on 4/3/14. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Action Pending JPML Decision. Motions terminated: 17 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/27/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kirk
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Theodore W. Maya
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?