Ramirez et al v. Taqueria Santa Rosa #1 et al
Plaintiff: Irma Ramirez and Daren Heatherly
Defendant: Taqueria Santa Rosa #1, James S. Colletto, John V. Colletto and Francisco G. Sahagun
Case Number: 3:2013cv05900
Filed: December 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT DECREE re 23 Proposed Order filed by Taqueria Santa Rosa #1, Francisco G. Sahagun. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/31/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/20/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION re 17 Stipulation filed by John V. Colletto, James S. Colletto. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/28/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/6/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. Taqueria Santa Rosa #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daren Heatherly
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taqueria Santa Rosa #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Colletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V. Colletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco G. Sahagun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?