Dana Rhinerson, et al -v- Van's International Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Rhinerson and Aidin Moradi
Defendant: Van's International Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05923
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 88 Motion to Stay to 10/20/2015.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (91) Stipulation to Deem Defendant Van's International Food's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint Applicable to Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-05923-VC, 3:15-cv-01509-VC, 3:15-cv-01723-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER as modified denying 80 Letter Brief, filed by Dana Rhinerson, Aidin Moradi. Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/1/2015. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 70 Notice of Withdrawal of Michael Resch filed by Van's International Foods, Inc. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/2/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MDL ORDER (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 71 Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Deadlines.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 68 Stipulation to Deem Defendant Van's International Food's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Applicable to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 65 Stipulation Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 63 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Niles Tansey; Benjamin Todd Diggs and Robert B. Hawk terminated.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 53 Motion to Continue the Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 40 Stipulation to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/7/14. (Filed on 5/9/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dana Rhinerson, et al -v- Van's International Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Rhinerson
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Campbell
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aidin Moradi
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Campbell
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van's International Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Todd Diggs
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?